Young v. Iowa, State of et al
Plaintiff: John Delroy Young
Defendant: Black Hawk County, IA, Iowa, State of, Black Hawk County Jail and Tony Thompson
Case Number: 6:2020cv02014
Filed: March 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Judge Kelly KE Mahoney
Referring Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2020 Filing 8 PRO SE MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff John Delroy Young. (NEF mailed to plaintiff) (pac)
April 8, 2020 Filing 7 PRO SE AMENDED Complaint against Black Hawk County Jail and Tony Thompson filed by John Delroy Young. (NEF mailed to plaintiff) (pac)
April 7, 2020 Filing 6 PRO SE MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff John Delroy Young. (NEF mailed to plaintiff) (pac)
March 31, 2020 Set Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 4/30/2020. Fee due by 4/30/2020. (kms)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #4 PRO SE Motion for service as premature: In order for a court to authorize the commencement of an action without the prepayment of the filing fee, a person must submit an affidavit that includes a statement of all the assets the person possesses. Plaintiff will be given thirty days from the date of this order to either pay the $400 filing fee or file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff will be given thirty days from the date of this order to file an amended complaint using the standard Section 1983 form and naming the individual defendants he alleges violated his rights. If plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint within thirty days this case will be dismissed with no further order of the Court. The Clerk of Court is directed to send plaintiff the standard Section 1983 form. [see ORDER] Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 3/31/2020. (NEF, Order, in forma pauperis form, and 1983 form mailed to plaintiff) (kms)
March 27, 2020 Filing 4 PRO SE MOTION for Service by Plaintiff John Delroy Young. (NEF mailed to plaintiff) (pac)
March 12, 2020 Filing 3 PRO SE SUPPLEMENT to #2 Complaint by John Delroy Young. (NEF mailed to Pltf) (jjh)
March 4, 2020 Filing 2 PRO SE COMPLAINT against Black Hawk County Jail, Black Hawk County, IA, Iowa, State of, filed by John Delroy Young. Dismissal Deadline 6/15/2020 (ksy)(NEF to Plf)(PSLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. Iowa, State of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black Hawk County, IA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iowa, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black Hawk County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Delroy Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?