Farmers Savings Bank et al v. AmTrust North America, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Farmers Savings Bank, Michael J Funke and Mark E White
Defendant: Wesco Insurance Company and AmTrust North America, Inc
Case Number: 6:2020cv02017
Filed: March 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TRIAL Management Order: Witness and exhibit lists exchanged by parties (but not filed) at least 21 days before FPTC. Exhibits marked. Motions in limine 21 days before FPTC. Bench Trial set for 8/16/2021 09:00 AM in Ctrm 4 (4th Floor) Cedar Rapids before Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts. Telephonic Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/30/2021 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/27/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 4/21/2020. (jag)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Upon consent of the parties, this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts for final disposition. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 4/16/2020. SCHEDULING Order and Discovery Plan: Initial Disclosures due date of 5/15/2020 but not filed with the court. Add Parties Deadline due by 7/28/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 7/28/2020. Plaintiffs Expert Witnesses due by 9/2/2020. Defendants Expert Witnesses due by 11/3/2020. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Experts due by 12/2/2020. Discovery due by 2/2/2021. Motions due by 3/3/2021. Trial Ready Deadline 8/2/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 4/16/2020. (jjh)
April 16, 2020 Filing 17 MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts: Scheduling Conference held on 4/16/2020. (Official Court Record: FTR Gold) (jjh)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Setting Hearing: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 4/16/2020 09:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts. See Order text for conference bridge instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 4/13/2020. (jag)
April 7, 2020 Filing 15 SEALED Exhibits to #7 State Court Petition by Wesco Insurance Company, AmTrust North America, Inc, Farmers Savings Bank, Michael J Funke, Mark E White (Price, Jeffrey) Modified text on 4/8/2020 (skm).
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 4/6/2020. (mmc)
April 3, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File Exhibits Under Seal by Defendants AmTrust North America, Inc, Wesco Insurance Company (Price, Jeffrey) Modified text on 4/6/2020 (skm).
March 24, 2020 Filing 12 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Farmers Savings Bank (Roberts, Cara)
March 20, 2020 Filing 11 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by AmTrust North America, Inc, Wesco Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Evergreen Parent, L.P. for AmTrust North America, Inc, Wesco Insurance Company. (Price, Jeffrey)
March 16, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Brad J Brady on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Brady, Brad)
March 13, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #7 Complaint by AmTrust North America, Inc, Wesco Insurance Company.(Price, Jeffrey) Modified text on 3/16/2020 (skm).
March 9, 2020 Set Deadlines: Defendant LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 3/27/2020. Plaintiff LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 4/6/2020. (skm)
March 9, 2020 Filing 8 DOCKET Annotation re #1 Notice of Removal: Please find attached the case packet for civil removal cases. (skm)
March 9, 2020 Filing 7 STATE Court Petition by Farmers Savings Bank, Michael J Funke, and Mark E White. (skm)
March 9, 2020 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: Upon review of the #3 and #4 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice and certificates of good standing, the court finds the motions should be granted. It is so ordered that Justin D. Wear and Jeffrey S. Price are authorized to appear on behalf of AmTrust North America, Inc., and Wesco Insurance Company (registration for e-filing with the Northern District of Iowa through PACER due by 3/23/2020). Signed by Clerk on 3/9/2020. (skm)
March 9, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline by 4/8/2020. (skm)
March 6, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jeffrey S. Price ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number AIANDC-3156399) by Defendants AmTrust, Wesco Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Gentsch, Drew)
March 6, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Justin D. Wear ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number AIANDC-3156397) by Defendants AmTrust, Wesco Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate in Good Standing) (Gentsch, Drew)
March 6, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Case Cover Sheet re #1 Notice of Removal. (Gentsch, Drew) Modified text on 3/9/2020 (skm).
March 6, 2020 Filing 1 JOINT NOTICE of Removal from Iowa District Court of Delaware County, case number LACV008683. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AIANDC-3156345), filed by Wesco Insurance Co., AmTrust. Scheduling Report due by 5/5/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint and Summons to Wesco, #2 Exhibit 2 - Acceptance of Service and Complaint and Summons) (Gentsch, Drew) Modified text on 3/9/2020 (skm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farmers Savings Bank et al v. AmTrust North America, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farmers Savings Bank
Represented By: Matthew L Preston
Represented By: Cara Lauren Roberts
Represented By: Brad J Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J Funke
Represented By: Matthew L Preston
Represented By: Cara Lauren Roberts
Represented By: Brad J Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark E White
Represented By: Matthew L Preston
Represented By: Cara Lauren Roberts
Represented By: Brad J Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wesco Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeffrey S Price
Represented By: Drew J Gentsch
Represented By: Justin D Wear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmTrust North America, Inc
Represented By: Jeffrey S Price
Represented By: Drew J Gentsch
Represented By: Justin D Wear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?