Nathem v. Nathem et al
Plaintiff: Wayne W. Nathem and Wayne W Nathem
Defendant: Joanne E Nathem, Allen Health Systems, Inc. and Allen Health Systems, Inc
Case Number: 6:2020cv02027
Filed: April 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Linda R Reade
Referring Judge: Mark A Roberts
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2020 Filing 12 RESISTANCE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Joanne E Nathem. (Verhulst, Thomas)
May 1, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE by Allen Health Systems, Inc of Serving #6 Counterclaim on Secretary of Treasury and Secretary of Labor (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Stefani, Ryan) Modified text on 5/4/2020 (skm).
April 30, 2020 Filing 10 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Allen Health Systems, Inc (Stefani, Ryan)
April 30, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #6 Answer to Crossclaim, Counterclaim by Joanne E Nathem.(Verhulst, Thomas)
April 29, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Defendant Allen Health Systems, Inc, Counter Claimant Allen Health Systems, Inc, Cross Defendant Allen Health Systems, Inc Responses due by 5/13/2020 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (Stefani, Ryan)
April 17, 2020 Filing 7 DOCKET Annotation re #1 Notice of Removal: Please find attached the new civil removal case packet (copy w/NEF to Plt). (skm)
April 17, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #5 First Amended Crossclaim and COUNTERCLAIM against Joanne E Nathem by Allen Health Systems, Inc (NEF to Plt).(skm)
April 17, 2020 Filing 5 FIRST AMENDED CROSSCLAIMS against Allen Health Systems, Inc., filed by Joanne E Nathem. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service) (NEF to Plt) (skm)
April 17, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #2 State Court Petition by Joanne E Nathem (NEF to Plt).(skm)
April 17, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 State Court Petition by Allen Health Systems, Inc (NEF to Plt).(skm)
April 17, 2020 Filing 2 STATE Court Petition with Jury Demand by Wayne W Nathem (NEF to Plt). (skm)
April 17, 2020 Set Deadlines: Defendant Allen Health Systems, Inc., LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 5/16/2020 (NEF mailed to Plt). (skm)
April 17, 2020 Judge Linda R Reade and Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added (conflicts checked; none found). (skm)
April 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from District Court for Black Hawk County, case number LACV136499. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AIANDC-3181413), filed by Joanne E Nathem. Scheduling Report due by 6/15/2020 (Verhulst, Thomas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/17/2020: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (skm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nathem v. Nathem et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joanne E Nathem
Represented By: Thomas C Verhulst
Represented By: Thomas C. Verhulst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen Health Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan Stefani
Represented By: Joseph A Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen Health Systems, Inc
Represented By: Ryan Stefani
Represented By: Joseph A Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne W. Nathem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne W Nathem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?