Brumfield v. Bauwns et al
Plaintiff: Marquis Dushan Brumfield
Defendant: Black Hawk County Jail and Sgt. Deputy Bauwns
Case Number: 6:2020cv02049
Filed: July 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Referring Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 PRO SE MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Marquis Dushan Brumfield. (Filed as such per PSLC)(NEF mailed to Def) (mmc)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 PRO SE MOTION to Amend Complaint by Plaintiff Marquis Dushan Brumfield. (Filed as such per PSLC)(NEF mailed to Def) (mmc)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Pro Se Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Marquis Dushan Brumfield. (Filed as such per PSLC)(NEF mailed to Def) (mmc)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 INITIAL Review Order: If Plaintiff fails to either pay the filing fee or file amended motions to proceed in forma pauperis within thirty days, the case or cases will be dismissed with no further order of the Court. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 7/14/2020. (order, IFP and 1983 forms mailed to Pltf) (jjh)
July 6, 2020 Filing 1 PRO SE MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Marquis Dushan Brumfield (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons) (Received on 6/29/2020) (filed as such pursuant to PSLC) (nef mailed to Plaintiff) (des)
July 6, 2020 Judge CJ Williams and Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. No conflicts identified. (des)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brumfield v. Bauwns et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black Hawk County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Deputy Bauwns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marquis Dushan Brumfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?