Smith v. United States Census Bureau, et al
Plaintiff: Carmen S Smith
Defendant: The United States Census Bureau, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Office of Personnel Management and United States Census Bureau
Case Number: 6:2020cv02059
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Referring Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:8701
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carmen S Smith. United States Census Bureau served on 10/1/2020, answer due 11/30/2020. (Baer, Kimberley)
October 7, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carmen S Smith. Office of Personnel Management served on 10/1/2020, answer due 11/30/2020. (Baer, Kimberley)
October 7, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.(Bengs, Tina)
September 21, 2020 Filing 9 *TEXT ORDER ONLY* granting #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Tina M Bengs (Pro Hac Vice Fee $100 receipt number AIANDC-3288387): Upon review of the motion and certificate of good standing, the court finds that the motion should be granted. It is so ordered that Attorney Tina M Bengs is authorized to appear on behalf of Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Signed by Clerk on 9/21/2020. (pac)
September 18, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Tina M. Bengs ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number AIANDC-3288387) by Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Bengs, Tina)
September 17, 2020 Answer due from Metropolitan Life Insurance Company extended to 10/12/2020. (mmc)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Unresisted Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company has up to and including 10/12/2020, to file an answer to the complaint or a responsive pleading. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 9/17/2020. (mmc)
September 15, 2020 Filing 6 UNRESISTED Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Townsend, Christine)
September 15, 2020 Filing 5 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Townsend, Christine)
September 15, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Christine E Bestor Townsend on behalf of Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Townsend, Christine)
September 2, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carmen S Smith. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company served on 8/31/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. (Baer, Kimberley)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Office of Personnel Management, and United States Census Bureau. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 Civil Case Packet) (pac)
August 19, 2020 Judge CJ Williams and Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added (no conflicts identified). (pac)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Office of Personnel Management, United States Census Bureau (Filing fee $400 receipt number AIANDC-3267506), filed by Carmen S Smith. Scheduling Report due by 11/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Baer, Kimberley) Modified text on 8/19/2020 (pac).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. United States Census Bureau, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen S Smith
Represented By: Kimberley K Baer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States Census Bureau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Tina M Bengs
Represented By: Christine E Bestor Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Personnel Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Census Bureau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?