Wilder v. C R Bard Inc et al
Plaintiff: Leonard Wilder
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, Does 1-100, C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 6:2020cv02062
Filed: August 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Office: Eastern Waterloo Office
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Referring Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 40 JOINT MOTION to Stay by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Lindenfeld, Noah)
October 14, 2020 Filing 39 PROPOSED Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan and Joint Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Report by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Lindenfeld, Noah)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Setting Deadline: The parties shall submit a proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan on or before October 14, 2020 in compliance with LR 16. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 9/23/2020. (jjh)
September 8, 2020 Filing 37 TEXT ORDER ONLY granting #34 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Steven S. Schulte , #36 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Eric M. Przybysz (conditional), #35 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Darren McDowell on behalf of Plaintiff Leonard Wilder: Upon review of the Motions and the Certificates of Good Standing, the Motions are granted. However, with respect to Attorney Przybysz, the Motion is granted on the condition that he register for CM/ECF by 9/18/2020 as ordered in case 20cv4044. Signed by Clerk on 9/8/2020. (kms)
September 4, 2020 Filing 36 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Eric M. Przybysz by Plaintiff Leonard Wilder (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - State Bar of Texas) (Schulte, Steve)
September 4, 2020 Filing 35 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Darren McDowell by Plaintiff Leonard Wilder (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - State Bar of Texas) (Schulte, Steve)
September 4, 2020 Filing 34 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Steven S. Schulte by Plaintiff Leonard Wilder (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - State Bar of Texas) (Schulte, Steve)
September 4, 2020 Filing 33 *TEXT ORDER* granting #31 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Noah Lindenfeld and #32 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John S. Gearan on behalf of Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. Upon a review of the Motions, the court finds the Motions should be granted. Signed by Clerk on 9/4/2020. (skm)
September 3, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John S. Gearan by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Gearan, John)
September 3, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Noah Lindenfeld ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number AIANDC-3278907) by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Lindenfeld, Noah)
September 1, 2020 Filing 30 STIPULATION of Dismissal Stipulation to Dismiss Claims Against McKesson Corporation Without Prejudice by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated, McKesson Corporation (Lederer, Gregory)
September 1, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney Jordan E Jarreau and Melissa Dorman Matthews on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated, McKesson Corporation (Lederer, Gregory)
September 1, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory M Lederer on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated, McKesson Corporation. (Lederer, Gregory)
August 21, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE to Attorneys Not Admitted to Practice in the United States District Court for the Northern District of Iowa (eAttys) (des) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/14/2020: #1 Receipt Confirmations) (des).
August 21, 2020 Filing 26 Case transferred in from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 3:20-cv-02412. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. NORTHERN DISTRICT OF IOWA DOCKET BEGINS HERE Modified on 8/21/2020 (des)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER grants #19 Motion to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out-of-State Plaintiffs Cases. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to sever and transfer this action as follows: a. Plaintiff Edward Bedrosian's case be severed and transferred to the Tampa Division of the Middle District of Florida (Civil case 3:20-cv-2404 opened); b. Plaintiff Vicki Carmichiel's case be severed and transferred to the Memphis Division of the Western District of Tennessee (Civil case 3:20-cv-2405 opened); c. Plaintiff Melanie Christian's case be severed and transferred to the Fort Pierce Division of the Southern District of Florida (Civil case 3:20-cv-2406 opened); d. Plaintiff Donna McCloskey's case be severed and transferred to the Pittsburgh Division of the Western District of Pennsylvania (Civil case 3:20-cv-2409 opened); e. Plaintiff Al Payne's case be severed and transferred to the Brooklyn Division of the Eastern District of New York (Civil case 3:20-cv-2410 opened); f. Plaintiff Larry Stewart's case be severed and transferred to the Chattanooga Division of the Eastern District of Tennessee (Civil case 3:20-cv-2411 opened); and g. Plaintiff Leonard Wilder's case be severed and transferred to the Cedar Rapids Division of the Northern District of Iowa (Civil case 3:20-cv-2412 opened). Plaintiff Marcelyn Moore is the sole plaintiff with any connection to this forum. Accordingly, she shall remain in the Dallas Division of the Northern District of Texas. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/20/2020) (jmg) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/21/2020.]
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: Pursuant to the parties' agreement, the Court DISMISSES WITHOUT PREJUDICE Plaintiff James Gleason's claims against Defendants. The parties shall bear their own costs. Party James Gleason terminated. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/19/2020) (axm) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/21/2020.]
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: Pursuant to the parties' agreement, the Court DISMISSES WITHOUT PREJUDICE Plaintiff Elroy Benally's claims against Defendants. The parties shall bear their own costs. Party Elroy Benally terminated. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/19/2020) (axm) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/21/2020.]
August 14, 2020 Filing 22 RESPONSE filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Inc re: #19 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/21/2020.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 21 Appendix in Support filed by Edward Bedrosian, Elroy Benally, Vicki Carmichiel, Melanie Christian, James Gleason, Donna McCloskey, Marcelyn Moore, Al Payne, Larry Stewart, Leonard Wilder re #19 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases Including Declaration and Exhibits (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/21/2020.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 20 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Edward Bedrosian, Elroy Benally, Vicki Carmichiel, Melanie Christian, James Gleason, Donna McCloskey, Marcelyn Moore, Al Payne, Larry Stewart, Leonard Wilder re #19 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/21/2020.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases filed by Edward Bedrosian, Elroy Benally, Vicki Carmichiel, Melanie Christian, James Gleason, Donna McCloskey, Marcelyn Moore, Al Payne, Larry Stewart, Leonard Wilder (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/21/2020.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE filed by Edward Bedrosian, Elroy Benally, Vicki Carmichiel, Melanie Christian, James Gleason, Donna McCloskey, Marcelyn Moore, Al Payne, Larry Stewart, Leonard Wilder re: #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/21/2020.]
July 22, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Filing Completed Forms For Each Plaintiff filed by Edward Bedrosian, Elroy Benally, Vicki Carmichiel, Melanie Christian, James Gleason, Donna McCloskey, Marcelyn Moore, Al Payne, Larry Stewart, Leonard Wilder (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/21/2020.]
July 21, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Filing Completed Forms for Each Plaintiff filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Responses) (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/21/2020.]
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: To assist the Court, counsel for all parties shall complete the form attached hereto as Exhibit A for each Plaintiff in this action. The parties shall file their completed forms on or before July 22, 2020. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/16/2020) (ndt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/21/2020.]
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court grants the parties' Agreed Motion for Extension of Time. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/1/2020) (ctf) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/21/2020.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Edward Bedrosian, Elroy Benally, Vicki Carmichiel, Melanie Christian, James Gleason, Donna McCloskey, Marcelyn Moore, Al Payne, Larry Stewart, Leonard Wilder (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/21/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corporation. (Jarreau, Jordan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/21/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by McKesson Corporation (Jarreau, Jordan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/21/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Filing 10 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by McKesson Corporation re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Jarreau, Jordan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/21/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by McKesson Corporation (Jarreau, Jordan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/21/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc (Jarreau, Jordan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/21/2020.]
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Case reassigned to Judge Karen Gren Scholer for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 6/12/2020) (ndt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/21/2020.]
June 11, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by C R Bard Inc. (Jarreau, Jordan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/21/2020.]
June 11, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc. (Jarreau, Jordan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/21/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 6 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/21/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 3 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc re #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Jarreau, Jordan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/21/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc (Jarreau, Jordan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/21/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by C R Bard Inc, Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10904532) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s) A - Portion of REACH Agreement (redacted), #4 Exhibit(s) B - McKesson page, #5 Exhibit(s) C - 8-30-16 Romney, Kim Deposition, #6 Exhibit(s) D Index of State Docs, #7 Exhibit(s) D-1 - State Court Docket Sheet, #8 Exhibit(s) D-2 - 2020-04-07 Plaintiffs' Original Petition, #9 Exhibit(s) D-3 - 2020-04-07 Civil Case Info. Sheet, #10 Exhibit(s) D-4 - 2020-04-07 Jury Demand, #11 Exhibit(s) D-5 - 2020-04-07 Citation Issued - Bard Peripheral, #12 Exhibit(s) D-6 - 2020-04-07 Citation Issued - C.R. Bard, #13 Exhibit(s) D-7 - 2020-04-07 Citation Issued - McKesson, #14 Exhibit(s) D-8 - 2020-05-06 Affidavit of Service - McKesson, #15 Exhibit(s) D-9 - 2020-05-22 Return of Service - C. R. Bard, #16 Exhibit(s) D-10 - 2020-06-04 Return of Service - Bard Peripheral) (Jarreau, Jordan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/21/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilder v. C R Bard Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jordan E Jarreau
Represented By: Gregory M Lederer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jordan E Jarreau
Represented By: John S Gearan, III
Represented By: Gregory M Lederer
Represented By: Noah Lindenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jordan E Jarreau
Represented By: John S Gearan, III
Represented By: Gregory M Lederer
Represented By: Noah Lindenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard Wilder
Represented By: Steve Schulte
Represented By: Eric Martin Przybysz
Represented By: Darren McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?