Brown v. United States of America
Petitioner: Deshawn Brown
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 6:2020cv02074
Filed: September 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Office: Eastern Waterloo Office
Presiding Judge: Linda R Reade
Referring Judge: Mark A Roberts
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 Filing 14 Case transferred in from District of Virginia Western; Case Number 7:19-cv-00498. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. NORTHERN DISTRICT OF IOWA DOCKET BEGINS HERE (copy of docket sheet mailed to petitioner) Modified on 9/18/2020 (des)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order dismissing without prejudice #7 Motion to Dismiss and denying #1 petition for a writ of habeas corpus, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. The petition is CONSTRUED as a motion to vacate, set aside, or correct the sentence under 28 U.S.C. 2255 and the 2255 action is transferred to the Northern District of Iowa, Eastern Division. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 9/18/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(ck) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 9/18/2020.]
September 18, 2020 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 9/18/2020. (Opinion mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(ck) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 9/18/2020.]
November 22, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. filed by Deshawn Brown. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(slt) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 9/18/2020.]
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Responses due by 12/1/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 10/22/2019. (slt) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 9/18/2020.]
October 21, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Deshawn Brown. Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(slt) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 9/18/2020.]
October 15, 2019 Filing 8 Roseboro Notice re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Deadline set for 11/8/2019. (slt) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 9/18/2020.]
October 11, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Breckon. (Baudinet, Michael) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 9/18/2020.]
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Response to Petition #1 due by 10/11/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 10/1/19. (PMS) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 9/18/2020.]
September 30, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Breckon. Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Baudinet, Michael) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 9/18/2020.]
August 12, 2019 Filing Fee Received $ 5, receipt number 7-61164 (ck) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 9/18/2020.]
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order of Service pursuant to Section 28 U.S.C. 2241 upon respondents re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Deshawn Brown. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 7/30/2019. (slt) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 9/18/2020.]
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 Consent to Fee by Petitioner Deshawn Brown (ck) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 9/18/2020.]
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order entered Conditionally Filing this action pursuant to 28 USC Section 2241; Regarding Statement of Assets;Consent to Fee; Deferring all action in this case; Advising inmate to comply within the allotted time and to notify of changes in address or risk dismissal Responses due by 8/12/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 7/18/2019. (tvt) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 9/18/2020.]
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 USC 2241, filed by Deshawn Brown. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Cover Letter)(slt) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 9/18/2020.] Modified docket entry on 9/18/2020 to 2255 Motion (des)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Timothy Lawrence Vavricek
Represented By: Lisa C Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Deshawn Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?