Iowa Voter Alliance et al v. Black Hawk County et al
Plaintiff: Michael C Angelos, Iowa Voter Alliance, Todd Obadal and Diane L Holst
Defendant: Scott County and Black Hawk County
Case Number: 6:2020cv02078
Filed: October 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Judge Kelly KE Mahoney
Referring Judge: Leonard T Strand
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:15483
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2020 Filing 32 JOINDER in Motion re #26 MOTION to Dismiss , #29 MOTION to Stay re #26 MOTION to Dismiss Due to Filing of Amended Complaint , #31 RENEWED MOTION to Dismiss filed by Scott County. (Cusack, Robert)
November 25, 2020 Filing 31 RENEWED MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Black Hawk County Responses due by 12/9/2020 (Attachments: #1 Brief) (Graham, Katie)
November 25, 2020 Filing 30 RESISTANCE to Motion re #29 MOTION to Stay re #26 MOTION to Dismiss Due to Filing of Amended Complaint filed by Black Hawk County. (Graham, Katie)
November 11, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION to Stay re #26 MOTION to Dismiss Due to Filing of Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs Michael C Angelos, Diane L Holst, Iowa Voter Alliance, Todd Obadal (Kaardal, Erick)
November 11, 2020 Filing 28 AMENDED Complaint With Jury Demand Amended Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants, filed by Iowa Voter Alliance, Todd Obadal, Diane L Holst, Michael C Angelos. (Kaardal, Erick)
October 28, 2020 Filing 27 JOINDER in Motion re #26 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Scott County. (Cusack, Robert)
October 28, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Black Hawk County Responses due by 11/12/2020 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit H, #3 Exhibit I) (Graham, Katie)
October 23, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Filing of Electronic Transcript: Administrative Order attached: Please read for instructions for actions parties/counsel may be required to take re #24 Transcript of Hearing on Temporary Restraining Order. (pac)
October 23, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript of Hearing on Temporary Restraining Order held on 10/20/2020, before Chief Judge Leonard T Strand. Court Reporter Shelly Semmler, Telephone number 712-233-3846. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased from the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter, the Clerk of Court's office, or PACER. Redaction Request due 11/13/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/23/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/21/2021. (pac)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying #6 Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Chief Judge Leonard T Strand on 10/20/2020. (skm)
October 20, 2020 Filing 22 SUPPLEMENT/ADDENDUM to #17 Brief in Opposition of #6 Motion, by Black Hawk County (Attachments: #1 Exhibit G) (Graham, Katie) Modified text to add link on 10/21/2020 (mmc).
October 20, 2020 Filing 21 MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Leonard T Strand: Motion Hearing held on 10/20/2020 re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Michael C Angelos, Iowa Voter Alliance, Todd Obadal, Diane L Holst. Ruling reserved. Order to follow. (Official Court Record: Shelly Semmler) (jag)
October 19, 2020 Filing 20 SUPPLEMENT/ADDENDUM to #17 Brief in Opposition of #6 Motion, by Black Hawk County (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Graham, Katie) Modified text on 10/20/2020 (mmc).
October 16, 2020 Filing 19 SUPPLEMENT/ADDENDUM to #17 Brief in Opposition of #6 Motion by Black Hawk County (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E) (Graham, Katie) Modified text to add link on 10/19/2020 (mmc).
October 15, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Lee Cusack on behalf of Scott County. (Cusack, Robert)
October 15, 2020 Filing 17 REPLY BRIEF to re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , BRIEF in Opposition re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Black Hawk County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Affidavit of Grant Veeder and Exhibits 1-4, #2 Exhibit B Declaration of Katie Graham and Exhibits 1-5, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Graham, Katie)
October 15, 2020 Filing 16 RESISTANCE to Motion re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Scott County. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit) (Cusack, Robert)
October 15, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Randall D Armentrout on behalf of Black Hawk County. (Armentrout, Randall)
October 15, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Katie Lynn Graham on behalf of Black Hawk County. (Graham, Katie)
October 13, 2020 Filing 13 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on the #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Erick G. Kaardal on behalf of Plaintiffs Michael C Angelos, Diane L Holst, Iowa Voter Alliance, and Todd Obadal. Upon a review of the Motion and the Certificate of Good Standing, the court finds the Motion should be granted. Signed by Clerk on 10/13/2020. (mmc)
October 12, 2020 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Second Declaration of Vincent J. Fahnlander by Michael C Angelos, Diane L Holst, Iowa Voter Alliance, Todd Obadal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit H, #2 Exhibit I, #3 Exhibit J) (Fahnlander, Vincent)
October 9, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Iowa Voter Alliance, Todd Obadal, Diane L Holst, Michael C Angelos. Black Hawk County served on 10/7/2020, answer due 10/28/2020; Scott County served on 10/7/2020, answer due 10/28/2020. (Fahnlander, Vincent)
October 9, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE by Michael C Angelos, Diane L Holst, Iowa Voter Alliance, Todd Obadal re #7 Order Setting Hearing on Motion,,, Set Deadlines,, Report of Notice (Proof of Service) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Fahnlander, Vincent)
October 9, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Erick G. Kaardal ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number AIANDC-3303641) by Plaintiffs Michael C Angelos, Diane L Holst, Iowa Voter Alliance, Todd Obadal (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Fahnlander, Vincent)
October 7, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent J Fahnlander on behalf of Iowa Voter Alliance. (Fahnlander, Vincent) Modified text on 10/8/2020 (mmc).
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order: Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 10/20/2020 09:30 AM before Chief Judge Leonard T Strand (see text of Order for conference instructions). Plaintiffs are responsible for providing notice of this action, the pending motion and this order to defendants as quickly as possible, whether through formal service or otherwise. On or before October 10, 2020, plaintiffs shall file a report describing the steps they have taken to comply with this notice requirement. Defendants shall file a response to the motion for temporary restraining order no later than October 15, 2020. Signed by Chief Judge Leonard T Strand on 10/7/2020. (skm)
October 6, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiffs Michael C Angelos, Diane L Holst, Iowa Voter Alliance, Todd Obadal (Attachments: #1 Notice of Hearing, #2 Brief, #3 Declaration of Vincent J. Fahnlander, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C (part 1), #7 Exhibit C (part 2), #8 Exhibit D, #9 Exhibit E, #10 Exhibit F, #11 Exhibit G, #12 Text of Proposed Order) (Fahnlander, Vincent)
October 5, 2020 Case Reassigned to Chief Judge Leonard T Strand and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney. Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney no longer assigned as presider to the case. (kms)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Reassignment of case to District Court Judge. This case will be reassigned to a District Court Judge. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 10/5/2020. (kms)
October 2, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Reassignment re #2 Notice MJ Case Assignment by Plaintiffs Michael C Angelos, Diane L Holst, Iowa Voter Alliance, Todd Obadal (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Fahnlander, Vincent)
October 2, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Civil Case Packet) (mmc)
October 2, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 11/2/2020. (mmc)
October 2, 2020 Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney added. Conflicts checked; none found. (mmc)
October 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Black Hawk County, Scott County ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AIANDC-3297696.), filed by Iowa Voter Alliance, Todd Obadal, Diane L Holst, Michael C Angelos. Scheduling Report due by 12/30/2020 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (Fahnlander, Vincent)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Iowa Voter Alliance et al v. Black Hawk County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott County
Represented By: Robert Lee Cusack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black Hawk County
Represented By: Randall D Armentrout
Represented By: Katie Lynn Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael C Angelos
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iowa Voter Alliance
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Obadal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane L Holst
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?