Bantz v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Vanese Bantz
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 6:2021cv02020
Filed: March 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Referring Judge: Leonard T Strand
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2021 Filing 4 TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David Chermol on behalf of Vanese Bantz. Upon review of the Motion and Certificate of Good Standing, the court finds the Motion should be granted. (CM/ECF Registration Check Status Deadline due by 5/24/2021.) Signed by Clerk on 5/10/2021. (sgw)
May 7, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David Chermol ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number AIANDC-3446182) by Plaintiff Vanese Bantz (Attachments: #1 EDPA) (Engler, Robert)
March 16, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Social Security Case Packet) (sgw)
March 16, 2021 Chief Judge Leonard T Strand and Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added (no conflicts identified) (sgw)
March 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AIANDC-3408740.), filed by Vanese Bantz. Dismissal Deadline 6/28/2021 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Engler, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bantz v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanese Bantz
Represented By: Robert J Engler
Represented By: David Chermol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?