Mcmartin v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Sidney Mcmartin
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 6:2021cv02034
Filed: June 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Judge Kelly KE Mahoney
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Kenneth Gillespie on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security. Withdrawal of Jacob A Schunk. (Gillespie, Matthew)
June 22, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob A Schunk on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security. (Schunk, Jacob)
June 15, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Social Security Case Packet) (skm)
June 15, 2021 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Sidney McMartin. Dismissal Deadline 9/27/2021. (skm)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The clerk is ordered to file the complaint and issue a summons. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 6/15/2021. (skm)
June 15, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 7/15/2021. (jag)
June 15, 2021 Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney added. No conflicts identified. (jag)
June 14, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Sidney Mcmartin (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kappelman, Wes)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mcmartin v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sidney Mcmartin
Represented By: Benjamin R Roth
Represented By: Wes Kappelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Jacob A Schunk
Represented By: Matthew Kenneth Gillespie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?