Grainger v. Precision of New Hampton, Inc
Plaintiff: Devin Grainger
Defendant: Precision of New Hampton, Inc
Case Number: 6:2022cv02043
Filed: October 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Judge Kelly KE Mahoney
Referring Judge: Leonard T Strand
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Removal-Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order ***DOCKET ANNOTATION re #18 Resistance to Motion, #19 Sealed Document : Hard copy received in Clerk's office. Sent FedEx to H. Andresen per chambers instruction. (ksy) Modified text on 12/12/2022 (ksy).
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SEALED Appendix Volume II in Support of Resistance to Plaintiff's Rule 23 Motion for Class Certification re #18 Resistance to #12 Motion to Certify Class. (Visser, Kevin) Modified text and links on 12/12/2022 (ksy).
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RESISTANCE to Motion re #12 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Precision of New Hampton, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Volume I) (Visser, Kevin)
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 UNRESISTED MOTION for Leave to File Overlength Brief and to Seal Attachment - Expedited Relief Requested by Defendant Precision of New Hampton, Inc (Attachments: #1 Brief Proposed Overlength Brief) (Visser, Kevin)
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING Order and Discovery Plan: Initial Disclosures due date of 12/7/2022 but not filed with the court. Add Parties Deadline due by 12/30/2022. Amended Pleadings due by 12/30/2022. Plaintiff's Expert Witness due by 3/31/2023. Defendant's Expert Witnesses due by 5/31/2023. Plaintiff's Rebuttal Experts due by 6/30/2023. Discovery due by 8/1/2023. Motions due by 9/8/2023. Trial Ready Deadline 2/5/2024. Class Certification Deadlines: Plaintiff's Motion due 12/1/2022. Defendant's Resistance due 12/15/2022. Plaintiff's reply due 12/22/2022. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 12/9/2022. (jag)
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 12/7/2022. Official Court Record: FTR Gold (jag)
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave to File Overlength Brief. Defendant may now file its overlength brief in resistance to plaintiff's Rule 23 Motion for Class Certification and may file its declaration in support under seal. Signed by Chief Judge Leonard T Strand on 12/9/22. (djs)
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE Order granting #13 UNRESISTED MOTION for Protective Order. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 12/8/22. (ksy)
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 UNRESISTED MOTION for Protective Order by Defendant Precision of New Hampton, Inc (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Stipulated Protective Order) (Petersen, Nicholas)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Certify Class by Plaintiff Devin Grainger Responses due by 12/14/2022 (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Plaintiff's Rule 23 Class Certification, #2 Exhibit A to Brief, Hansen deposition transcript, #3 Exhibit B to Brief, Underwood deposition transcript, #4 Exhibit C to Brief, Willems Declaration) (Willems, Nathan) Modified text on 12/1/2022 (ksy).
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ** TEXT ORDER ONLY ** Setting Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 12/7/2022 at 2:30 PM (Telephonic Zoom Hearing - instructions emailed to attorneys on 11/28/2022) before Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney. Signed by United States Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 11/28/2022. (Gollhofer, Jami)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Reassigned to Chief Judge Leonard T Strand and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney. Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney no longer assigned to the case as presider. Motions referred to Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney. No conflicts identified. (kms)
November 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PROPOSED Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan by Defendant Precision of New Hampton, Inc (Petersen, Nicholas)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Precision of New Hampton, Inc identifying Other Affiliate Hot Flush, Inc., Other Affiliate Earth Wind Fire Energy, Inc. for Precision of New Hampton, Inc. (Visser, Kevin)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 11/2/2022 re #6 Unresisted Motion to Extend Class Certification Deadline filed by Precision of New Hampton, Inc. Motion is denied as moot. No Order to follow. Official Court Record: FTR Gold (jag)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ** TEXT ORDER ONLY ** Setting Hearing on Motion #6 MOTION to Extend Class Certification Deadlines: Motion Hearing set for 11/2/2022 at 10:00 AM (Telephonic Hearing - Zoom instructions emailed to attorneys of record on 11/01/2022) before Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney. Signed by United States Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 11/01/2022. (Gollhofer, Jami)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 UNRESISTED MOTION to Extend Class Certification Deadlines by Defendant Precision of New Hampton, Inc. (skm)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DOCKET Annotation re #1 Notice of Removal: Please review the attached Civil Removal Actions case packet. (skm)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check status by 11/16/2022. (skm)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ANSWER With Jury Demand to #2 Second Amended Class Action State Court Petition by Precision of New Hampton, Inc.(skm)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SECOND AMENDED Class Action State Court Petition by Devin Grainger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C). (skm)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney added (no conflicts found). (skm)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Deadline: Defendant Precision of New Hampton, Inc LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 11/4/2022. (skm)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Iowa District Court for Chickasaw County, case number LACV004294. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AIANDC-3774692), filed by Precision of New Hampton, Inc. Scheduling Report due by 12/13/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Pending Motion, #3 Exhibit C - LR 81 Statement, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Visser, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grainger v. Precision of New Hampton, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devin Grainger
Represented By: Nathan T Willems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Precision of New Hampton, Inc
Represented By: Kevin J Visser
Represented By: Nicholas Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?