Artisani v. Naph Care et al
Plaintiff: Nersius Adonliel Artisani and Roger Joseph Hoffert, Jr
Defendant: Naph Care, Dr Nicholas Goetsch, Dr John Rizzi, Dr Kathy Unknown, Jessica Frater, Julie Foster, Jaquie Unknown and Dr Bartelt
Case Number: 6:2023cv02089
Filed: December 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Referring Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2024 FEE Receipt: $ 405, receipt number 471 for Civil Filing Fee by Nersius Adonliel Artisani (klh)
January 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #10 Pro Se Motion for Extension of Time to pay the filing fee by Plaintiff Nersius Adonliel Artisani: The Court will grant plaintiff an additional 45 days from the date of this order to pay the full filing fee. In addition, the Court directs the Black Hawk County Attorney 30 days to provide a response limited to plaintiff's allegations regarding his prior payment of the filing fee via CHIME. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 1/23/2024. (Copy to Plaintiff/Copy of Order/Complaint/Motion to Black Hawk County Attorney) (des)
January 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER denying #11 Motion to Set Aside Order #11 MOTION to Set Aside/Reconsider Order #8 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel,, Order on Motion for Recusal,, Order on Motion to Amend or Correct. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 1/20/24. (CJW) NEF mailed to Plaintiff on 1/22/2024 (pac).
January 18, 2024 Filing 11 PRO SE MOTION to Reconsider #8 Order by Plaintiff Nersius Adonliel Artisani (PSLC) (NEF to Paintiff) (des)
January 17, 2024 Filing 13 PRO SE MOTION to Amend #9 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Nersius Adonliel Artisani. (PSLC)(NEF to Plaintiff) (ksy)
January 11, 2024 Filing 10 PRO SE MOTION for Extension of Time to Pay Filing Fee by Plaintiff Nersius Adonliel Artisani. (PSLC)(NEF to Plaintiff) (ksy)
December 29, 2023 Filing 9 AMENDED Pro Se Complaint with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Nersius Adonliel Artisani. (NEF to Plaintiff) (mmc)
December 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #5 Motion for Recusal; denying without prejudice #2 Motion to Appoint Counsel; granting #7 Motion to Amend Complaint. The Clerk's Office is directed to detach and file the Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 12/29/2023. (Copy to Plaintiff) (mmc)
December 21, 2023 Filing 7 PRO SE MOTION to Amend Complaint by Plaintiff Nersius Adonliel Artisani (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Cover Letter) (PSLC) (NEF to Plaintiff) (des)
December 21, 2023 Filing 6 PRO SE Correspondence by Nersius Adonliel Artisani. (PSLC) (NEF to Plaintiff) (rjs)
December 21, 2023 PARTIAL Filing Fee: $ 5.00, receipt number 3110 (rjs)
December 19, 2023 Filing 5 PRO SE MOTION for Recusal by Plaintiff Nersius Adonliel Artisani (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents) (PSLC) (NEF to Plaintiff) (jlh)
December 11, 2023 Filing 4 SEALED PRO SE SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint by PlaintiffNersius Adonliel Artisani. (PSLC)(NEF to Plaintiff) (kms)
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Plaintiff to pay full $405 filing fee and file an amended complaint by 1/10/2024. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 12/11/2023. (Copy/1983 Form to Plaintiff (des)
December 6, 2023 Filing 2 PRO SE MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Nersius Adonliel Artisani (PSLC) (NEF to Palinitff) (jlh)
December 6, 2023 Filing 1 SEALED PRO SE COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Nersius Adonliel Artisani. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (PSLC) (NEF to Plaintiff.) (jlh) Modified security on 12/8/2023 (jlh)
December 6, 2023 Judge CJ Williams and Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. No conflicts identified. (jlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Artisani v. Naph Care et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nersius Adonliel Artisani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Joseph Hoffert, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Naph Care
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Nicholas Goetsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr John Rizzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Kathy Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Frater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaquie Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Bartelt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?