Cornelsen v. MV Transportation, Inc.
Plaintiff: Bradley R. Cornelsen
Defendant: MV Transportation, Inc. and MV Contract Transportation Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00037
Filed: October 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: Celeste F Bremer
2 Judge: James E Gritzner
3 Judge: Stephanie M Rose
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Amended Complaint) by MV Transportation, Inc.. Responses due by 12/24/2018. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support)(Jones, Kathryn)
November 30, 2018 Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Kelly R. Vickers. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 11/30/2018. (kjw)
November 29, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by MV Transportation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Vickers, Kelly)
November 26, 2018 Filing 12 PRO SE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against MV Contract Transportation, Inc, MV Transportation, Inc., filed by Bradley R. Cornelsen. (vr)
November 21, 2018 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by MV Transportation, Inc.. (Jones, Kathryn)
November 20, 2018 Filing 10 TEXT ORDER denying #9 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 11/20/2018. (k) (hard copy mailed to plaintiff at YANKTON-FPCP.O. Box 700Yankton, SD 57078)
November 19, 2018 Filing 9 PRO SE MOTION for Reconsideration re #7 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel by Bradley R. Cornelsen.Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. Responses due by 12/3/2018. (vr)
November 14, 2018 Filing 8 REPLY Brief re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by MV Transportation, Inc..(Jones, Kathryn)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #4 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 11/9/2018. (k) (hard copy mailed to Plaintiff at P.O. Box 700 Yankton, SD 57078)
November 8, 2018 Filing 6 PRO SE RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Bradley R. Cornelsen. Replies due by 11/15/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1) (vr)
November 2, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by MV Transportation, Inc.. Responses due by 11/16/2018. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support)(Jones, Kathryn)
October 31, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Resistance to Motion for Extension of time to Answer by Bradley R. Cornelsen. Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. Responses due by 11/14/2018. (slg) (Main Document 4 replaced on 11/1/2018) corrected envelope (don).
October 24, 2018 Filing 3 TEXT ORDER granting #2 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendants shall have to and including Monday 11/5/2018 to move or plead to the complaint. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 10/24/2018. (k)
October 23, 2018 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 11/21/2018. (kmc)
October 23, 2018 Judge Stephanie M. Rose and Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams added. Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer and Senior Judge James E. Gritzner no longer assigned to case. Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. (don)
October 22, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by MV Transportation, Inc..Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. (Jones, Kathryn)
October 22, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MV Transportation, Inc. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3628520., filed by MV Transportation, Inc.. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 1/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Jones, Kathryn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cornelsen v. MV Transportation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MV Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn E Jones
Represented By: Kelly Vickers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MV Contract Transportation Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley R. Cornelsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?