State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. Ontel Products Corporation
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Defendant: Ontel Products Corporation
Case Number: 1:2018cv00039
Filed: November 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger
Referring Judge: Stephen B Jackson
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332lp
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REGARDING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE REQUIREMENTS. See order for deadlines and form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 1/11/2019. (jeb)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING AND TRIAL SETTING ORDER. Jury Trial set to begin 3/16/2020 9:00 AM in Council Bluffs before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Estimated length 3 days. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/20/2020 10:00 AM in Council Bluffs. Initial Disclosures due by 1/18/2019. Motions to Add Parties due by 3/8/2019. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 3/8/2019. Plaintiff's Expert Witness Disclosures due by 5/10/2019. Defendant's Expert Witness Disclosures due by 7/12/2019. Plaintiff's Rebuttal Expert Witness Disclosures due by 8/9/2019. Discovery Deadline 9/4/2019. Dispositive Motion Deadline 10/4/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 1/11/2019. (jeb)
January 10, 2019 Filing 11 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr.: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 1/10/2019. Attorney Jonathan Levy appeared for plaintiff. Attorney Clark Mitchell appeared for defendant. Scheduling order to be entered. Total Court Time: 5 minutes. (jeb)
January 10, 2019 Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr added as presider. Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger no longer assigned to case. (sjc)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF REFERENCE - CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This matter is referred to a U.S. Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings and entry of judgment in accordance with 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and the consent of the parties. Signed by Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger on 1/9/2019. (hfh)
January 8, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN AND CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A MAGISTRATE . (Lindebak, Aaron)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: The parties were previously ordered to confer and file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan as provided under L.R. 16 by January 7, 2019, but have not done so. See Dkt. No. #4 . Consequently, the parties shall confer and file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan by no later than noon on January 9, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 1/8/2019. (jeb)
January 6, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Ontel Products Corporation. (Lindebak, Aaron)
January 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Wehde Lindebak on behalf of Ontel Products Corporation (Lindebak, Aaron)
December 28, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Levy, Jonathan)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference shall be held on January 10, 2019, at 11:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. The parties shall confer and file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan as provided under L.R. 16 by January 7, 2019. To join the conference, counsel shall call 866-590-5055 and utilize access code 8811585. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 12/21/2018. (jeb)
December 19, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint affirmative defenses, and jury demand by Ontel Products Corporation.(Mitchell, Clark)
December 12, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Ontel Products Corporation served on 12/6/2018, answer due 12/27/2018. (Levy, Jonathan)
November 30, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for plaintiff 12/28/2018. Summons and 7.1 packet emailed to counsel. (sjc)
November 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ontel Products Corporation Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3661980., filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 2/27/2019. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 2/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Levy, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. Ontel Products Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Jonathan M. Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ontel Products Corporation
Represented By: Clark I Mitchell
Represented By: Aaron Wehde Lindebak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?