St. John v. Gurstel Law Firm, P.C.

Plaintiff: Shawn St. John
Defendant: Gurstel Law Firm, P.C.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00002
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
0 Judge: James E Gritzner
1 Judge: Stephen B Jackson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR CLOSING DOCUMENTS: In light of the Notice of Settlement #4 , and as requested by plaintiff, the parties shall have until May 3, 2019, to file dismissal documents for this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 3/5/2019. (jeb)
March 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Settlement by Shawn St. John (Gamble, Kristin)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Kai Loftus on behalf of Gurstel Law Firm, P.C. (Loftus, Christopher)
February 13, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shawn St. John. Gurstel Law Firm, P.C. served on 2/1/2019, answer due 2/22/2019. (Gamble, Kristin) Modified on 2/13/2019 to correct filer (ml).
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gurstel Law Firm, P.C. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3700014., filed by Shawn St. John. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 4/15/2019. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 4/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - January 11, 2018 Letter, #2 Exhibit B - January 25, 2018 Dispute Letter, #3 Exhibit C - March 5, 2018 Letter, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons)(Gamble, Kristin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: St. John v. Gurstel Law Firm, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gurstel Law Firm, P.C.
Represented By: Christopher Kai Loftus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn St. John
Represented By: Kristin K. Gamble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?