Olson v. Ameristar Casino Council Bluffs, LLC
Plaintiff: Matthew B Olson and Matthew B. Olson
Defendant: Ameristar Casino Council Bluffs, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00005
Filed: February 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Stephen B Jackson
Referring Judge: Charles R Wolle
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER REGARDING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE REQUIREMENTS. See order for deadlines and form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 4/12/2019. (jeb)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING AND TRIAL SETTING ORDER. Jury Trial set to begin 7/27/2020 9:00 AM in Council Bluffs Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. for estimated 5 days. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/25/2020 10:00 AM in Council Bluffs Courthouse. Initial Disclosures due by 5/1/2019. Motions to Add Parties due by 7/1/2019. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 7/1/2019. Plaintiff's Expert Witness Disclosures due by 8/12/2019. Defendant's Expert Witness Disclosures due by 9/30/2019. Discovery Deadline 12/2/2019. Dispositive Motion Deadline 1/2/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 4/12/2019. (jeb)
April 11, 2019 Filing 21 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr.: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 4/11/2019. Attorney Raymond Aranza appeared for plaintiff. Attorney Rex Fennessey appeared for defendant. Scheduling order to be entered. Total Court Time: 20 minutes. (jeb)
April 9, 2019 Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr added as presider. Senior Judge Charles R. Wolle no longer assigned to case. (sjc)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER. Upon the consent of the parties, and in accordance with the provisions of 28 U.S.C. section 636 (c), the parties waive their right to proceed before a Judge of the United States District Court and consent to have a United States Magistrate Judge conduct any and all further proceedings and order the entry of judgment in this case. Signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Wolle on 4/8/2019. (alb)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER. Because the parties have consented to trial, disposition and judgment by a U.S. Magistrate Judge, the hearing scheduled to be held by the undersigned judge on 4/10/19 is canceled. Signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Wolle on 4/8/2019. (alb)
April 8, 2019 Filing 18 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN . (Fennessey, Rex)
April 2, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings re TEXT ORDER #17 : Motion Hearing is set for 4/10/2019 at 10:00 AM via Telephone Conference. Counsel shall call 1-888-636-3807 and enter code 5261674. Hearing will be held before Senior Judge Charles R. Wolle. (sjc)
April 1, 2019 Set Hearing: Hearing by telephone conference call 10:00 a.m. on 4/10/19. See order for call-in number. (alb)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER. Hearing on defendant's resisted motion for partial summary judgment (Docket #2 ) will be held by telephone conference call at 10:00 a.m. on April 10, 2019. Counsel wishing to participate in the hearing shall phone 1-888-636-3807, using the Access Code 5261674. Signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Wolle on 4/1/2019. (alb)
March 22, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY Memorandum in Support re #2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Motion for Partial Dismissal of Plaintiff's Fifth, Sixth, and Seventh Claims for Relief in Amended Complaint filed by Ameristar Casino Council Bluffs, LLC.(Fennessey, Rex)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference shall be held on April 11, 2019, at 1:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. The parties shall confer and file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan as provided under L.R. 16 by April 8, 2019. To join the conference, counsel shall call 866-590-5055 and utilize access code 8811585. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 3/20/2019. (jeb)
March 15, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Motion for Partial Dismissal of Plaintiff's Fifth, Sixth, and Seventh Claims for Relief in Amended Complaint filed by Matthew B. Olson. Replies due by 3/22/2019.(Aranza, Raymond)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting #10 & #12 plaintiff's unopposed Motion to Extend. As requested, plaintiff shall have until March 22, 2019, to respond to defendant's Motion for Partial Dismissal #2 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 3/6/2019. (jeb)
March 6, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Amend/Correct Motion to Extend by Matthew B. Olson.Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Responses due by 3/20/2019. (Aranza, Raymond)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER FOR L.R. 7(k) STATEMENT: Plaintiff's counsel shall consult with counsel for defendant pursuant to Local Rule 7(k) as to whether defendant consents to Plaintiff's Motion to Extend #10 and then file a supplementation to the motion by March 8, 2019, indicating defendant's position. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 3/5/2019. (jeb)
March 5, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Dismiss by Matthew B. Olson.Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Responses due by 3/19/2019. (Aranza, Raymond)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Stephen B. Maule; granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice John J. Marino Jr.; granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Rex P. Fennessey. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr on 2/22/2019. (kjw)
February 21, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3740245 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Ameristar Casino Council Bluffs, LLC. (Muldoon, Ryan)
February 21, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt number 0863-3740187 by Ameristar Casino Council Bluffs, LLC. (Muldoon, Ryan) Modified on 2/21/2019, added payment information (kjw).
February 21, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt number 0863-3738272 by Ameristar Casino Council Bluffs, LLC. (Muldoon, Ryan) Modified on 2/21/2019, added payment information (kjw).
February 20, 2019 Filing 5 **Attorney to refile motions correctly and pay the fee** MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ameristar Casino Council Bluffs, LLC. (Muldoon, Ryan) Modified on 2/21/2019 (kjw).
February 20, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Ameristar Casino Council Bluffs, LLC. (Muldoon, Ryan)
February 20, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint Defendant's Answer to Amended Complaint by Ameristar Casino Council Bluffs, LLC.(Muldoon, Ryan)
February 20, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Motion for Partial Dismissal of Plaintiff's Fifth, Sixth, and Seventh Claims for Relief in Amended Complaint by Ameristar Casino Council Bluffs, LLC. Responses due by 3/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Motion for Partial Dismissal)(Muldoon, Ryan)
February 14, 2019 Set Deadline: Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 3/13/2019. 7.1 packet emailed to counsel. (sjc)
February 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ameristar Casino Council Bluffs, LLC from Iowa District Court In and For Pottawattamie County, case number CVCV118440. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3731956., filed by Ameristar Casino Council Bluffs, LLC. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 5/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- State Court Pleadings, Process, and Orders, #2 Exhibit 2- Affidavit of Stephen B. Maule, #3 Exhibit 3- Ameristar Casino Council Bluffs, LLC Information, #4 Exhibit 4- Affidavit of Maureen Maley, #5 Exhibit 5- Jury Verdict Information, #6 Exhibit 6- Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Muldoon, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Olson v. Ameristar Casino Council Bluffs, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ameristar Casino Council Bluffs, LLC
Represented By: Ryan Joseph Muldoon
Represented By: Stephen B. Maule
Represented By: Rex P. Fennessey
Represented By: John J. Marino, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew B Olson
Represented By: Raymond R Aranza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew B. Olson
Represented By: Raymond R Aranza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?