Bigge v. Singh et al
Plaintiff: Richard Bigge
Defendant: Alpha One Trucking, Inc. and Kudlip Singh
Case Number: 1:2019cv00019
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Celeste F Bremer
Referring Judge: John A Jarvey
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Richard Bigge. (Moore, Roger)
August 29, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Alpha One Trucking, Inc., Kudlip Singh. (Veik, Heather)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Heather Veik. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 8/22/2019. (slg)
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3902758 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Alpha One Trucking, Inc., Kudlip Singh. (Veik, Heather)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Alpha One Trucking, Inc., Kudlip Singh.(Rusch, Matthew)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 Errata Amended Notice of Removal re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Alpha One Trucking, Inc., Kudlip Singh. (Rusch, Matthew)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 9/13/2019. (sjc)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Alpha One Trucking, Inc., Kudlip Singh from District Court in Pottawattamie County, case number CVCV119412. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3892012., filed by Alpha One Trucking, Inc., Kudlip Singh. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 11/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Filings)(Rusch, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bigge v. Singh et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alpha One Trucking, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew V Rusch
Represented By: Heather B. Veik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kudlip Singh
Represented By: Matthew V Rusch
Represented By: Heather B. Veik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Bigge
Represented By: Roger D. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?