Holloway v. Edwards et al
Plaintiff: Walter H. Holloway
Defendant: James Edwards, State of Nebraska, State of Iowa and Chevy Cadillac Dealership
Case Number: 1:2019cv00025
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: Stephanie M Rose
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENTAL by Walter H. Holloway. (kjw)
October 28, 2019 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENTAL by Walter H. Holloway. (Attachments: #1 Additional documents) (kjw)
October 24, 2019 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENTAL by Walter H. Holloway. (kjw)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee to commence a civil action or complete an application to proceed in forma pauperis. A copy of this Order and the attached IFP application have been mailed to Plaintiff at 2223 Jones Apt #2, Omaha, NE 68102. Signed by Judge Stephanie M. Rose on 10/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supplement IFP) (jch)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Walter H. Holloway. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 12/19/2019. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 12/19/2019. (don)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holloway v. Edwards et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Nebraska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Iowa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevy Cadillac Dealership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter H. Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?