Wood et al v. Coaster Pedicab Manufacturing, LLC
Plaintiff: Pattarapon Wood and Dean L. Wood, Jr.
Defendant: Coaster Pedicab Manufacturing, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00029
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger
Referring Judge: Stephen B Jackson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR CLOSING DOCUMENTS: Defendant has filed a Notice of Settlement #8 . Consequently, the telephonic scheduling conference shall be cancelled. The parties shall file closing documents for the case by January 3, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 12/2/2019. (jeb)
December 2, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Settlement by Coaster Pedicab Manufacturing, LLC (Sturdivan, Sean)
November 27, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN . (Sturdivan, Sean)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference shall be held on December 3, 2019 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. The parties shall confer and file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan as provided under L.R. 16 by November 29, 2019. To join the conference, counsel shall call 866-590-5055 and utilize access code 8811585. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 11/20/2019. (jeb)
November 18, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Coaster Pedicab Manufacturing, LLC. (Sturdivan, Sean)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jacob D. Bielenberg. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr on 10/24/2019. (kjw)
October 23, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3957555 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Coaster Pedicab Manufacturing, LLC. (Bielenberg, Jacob)
October 16, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 11/15/2019. (sjc)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Coaster Pedicab Manufacturing, LLC from Pottawattamie, case number LACV119209. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3949368., filed by Coaster Pedicab Manufacturing, LLC. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 1/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sturdivan, Sean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wood et al v. Coaster Pedicab Manufacturing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pattarapon Wood
Represented By: Kelly N. Wyman
Represented By: Dean T Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dean L. Wood, Jr.
Represented By: Kelly N. Wyman
Represented By: Dean T Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coaster Pedicab Manufacturing, LLC
Represented By: Sean Michael Sturdivan
Represented By: Jacob D. Bielenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?