Risen Son Christian Village v. The Cincinnati Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Risen Son Christian Village
Defendant: The Cincinnati Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv00007
Filed: February 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: Stephanie M Rose
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCES. See Order for more particulars. Status Conference set for 6/22/2020 11:00 AM in Phone Hearing(HCA). Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783. Hearing will be held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Status Conference set for 8/24/2020 11:00 AM in Phone Hearing(HCA). Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783. Hearing will be held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Status Conference set for 10/26/2020 11:00 AM in Phone Hearing(HCA). Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783. Hearing will be held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Status Conference set for 12/18/2020 11:00 AM in Phone Hearing(HCA). Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783. Hearing will be held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams.. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 4/21/2020. (imk)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REGARDING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE REQUIREMENTS. See Order for particulars. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 4/21/2020. (imk)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER adopting #15 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN: Initial Disclosures Deadline 4/28/2020. Motions to Add Parties due by 6/15/2020. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 6/15/2020. Plaintiffs Expert Witness Disclosures due by 7/14/2020. Defendants Expert Witness Disclosures due by 9/14/2020. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Witness Disclosures due by 10/14/2020. Discovery Deadline 12/14/2020. Dispositive Motion Deadline 1/14/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/31/2021 10:00 AM in Council Bluffs before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Jury Trial set for 6/21/2021 09:00 AM in Council Bluffs before Judge Stephanie M. Rose. Estimated length of five days. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 4/21/2020. (imk)
April 21, 2020 Filing 16 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams: Scheduling Conference held on 4/21/2020. Attorney Matthew Rusch appeared for plaintiff. Attorneys Sean O'Brien and Michael Baniak appeared for defendant. Status of case discussed. Separate Orders to follow. Total Court Time: 13 minutes. (imk)
April 14, 2020 Filing 15 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN . (Rusch, Matthew)
March 23, 2020 Filing 14 TEXT ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. A Telephonic Scheduling Conference shall be held on 4/21/2020 at 10:00 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Counsel should call 1-877-336-1829 and enter access code 1176783 at the prompt to be joined with the call. The parties shall file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan as provided under L.R. 16 by 4/14/2020. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 3/23/2020. (imk)
March 19, 2020 Filing 13 Cincinnati's Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) and Affirmative Defenses by The Cincinnati Insurance Company.(Baniak, Michael)
March 19, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Risen Son Christian Village. (Rusch, Matthew)
March 16, 2020 Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Cincinnati Insurance Company answer due 3/27/2020. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 3/16/2020. (imk)
March 13, 2020 Filing 10 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by The Cincinnati Insurance Company.Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. (Baniak, Michael)
March 6, 2020 Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal by The Cincinnati Insurance Company. Defendant may have to and including 3/12/2020 to file a responsive pleading. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 3/6/2020. (k)
March 5, 2020 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by The Cincinnati Insurance Company.Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. (Baniak, Michael)
March 4, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Baniak, Michael)
March 2, 2020 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Michael P. Baniak; granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Dennis M. Dolan. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 3/2/2020. (kjw)
March 2, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-4076460 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Dolan, Dennis)
March 2, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-4076285 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Baniak, Michael)
February 28, 2020 Filing 2 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for plaintiff 3/19/2020. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 3/27/2020. (kmc)
February 27, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Cincinnati Insurance Company from Pottawattamie, case number LACV120252. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-4073138., filed by The Cincinnati Insurance Company. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 5/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Petition and Exhibit, #2 Exhibit Acknowledgment, #3 Exhibit Original Notice, #4 Exhibit Anderson Contract)(OBrien, Sean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Risen Son Christian Village v. The Cincinnati Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cincinnati Insurance Company
Represented By: Sean M OBrien
Represented By: Michael P. Baniak
Represented By: Sean M. O'Brien
Represented By: Dennis M. Dolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Risen Son Christian Village
Represented By: Matthew V Rusch
Represented By: Nicholas Franklin Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?