GLJ, Inc v. United States of America. et al
Plaintiff: GLJ, Inc.
Defendant: United States Department of Defense, United States of America and United States Air Force
Case Number: 1:2020cv00009
Filed: March 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger
Referring Judge: Stephen B Jackson
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #9 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to File Resistance to Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff shall have until June 3, 2020, to respond to United States of America's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction #8 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 4/29/2020. (jeb)
April 29, 2020 Filing 9 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Resistance to Motion to Dismiss by GLJ, Inc..Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Responses due by 5/13/2020. (Dornan, Stuart)
April 20, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by United States Air Force, United States Department of Defense, United States of America.Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Responses due by 5/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Rey, Eric)
April 14, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Anthony Rey on behalf of All Defendants (Rey, Eric)
April 1, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GLJ, Inc.. United States Air Force served on 3/11/2020, answer due 5/11/2020. (Dornan, Stuart)
March 16, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by GLJ, Inc.. (Dornan, Stuart)
March 16, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GLJ, Inc.. United States Department of Defense served on 3/11/2020, answer due 05/11/2020. (Dornan, Stuart) Modified on 3/25/2020 added answer ddl (don).
March 16, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GLJ, Inc.. United States of America served on 3/11/2020, answer due 5/11/2020. (Dornan, Stuart)
March 4, 2020 Set Deadline: Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for plaintiff 3/25/2020. (rav)
March 3, 2020 Filing 2 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet. Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements.(rav) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/4/2020: #1 Corporate Disclosure Packet) (rav).
March 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-4076719., filed by GLJ, Inc.. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 6/1/2020. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 6/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dornan, Stuart)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GLJ, Inc v. United States of America. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLJ, Inc.
Represented By: Stuart J Dornan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Defense
Represented By: Eric Anthony Rey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Eric Anthony Rey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Air Force
Represented By: Eric Anthony Rey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?