Lovely v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Rodney L. Lovely
Defendant: Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust and Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00010
Filed: March 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Celeste F Bremer
Referring Judge: Charles R Wolle
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Three-day jury trial set before the Honorable Celeste F. Bremer beginning on May 17, 2021, at the U.S. Courthouse in Council Bluffs, Iowa. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10:00 a.m. May 3, 2021, before the Honorable Celeste F. Bremer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 4/30/2020. (mlr)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER: A Status Conference is set for 11:30 a.m. on August 13, 2020, by telephone. Counsel shall call 1-866-590-5055 and enter code 7013731 at the prompt. A Joint Agenda shall be filed by 4:00 p.m. on August 10, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 4/30/2020. (mlr)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER adopting #5 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN: Three-day Jury Trial set for 5/17/2021 09:00 AM in Council Bluffs before Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer. Motions to Add Parties due by 5/11/2020. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 5/11/2020. Plaintiffs Expert Witness Disclosures due by 7/31/2020. Status Conference set for 8/13/2020 11:30 AM in Phone Hearing. Counsel shall call 1-866-590-5055 and enter code 7013731. Defendants Expert Witness Disclosures due by 9/30/2020. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Witness Disclosures due by 10/31/2020. Discovery Deadline 1/8/2021. Dispositive Motion Deadline 2/4/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/3/2021 10:00 AM in Phone Hearing. Counsel shall call 1-866-590-5055 and enter code 7013731. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 4/30/2020. (mlr)
April 29, 2020 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer: Status Conference held on 4/29/2020. (kmp) (Main Document 10 replaced on 5/5/2020 to correct typographical error ) (kmp).
April 17, 2020 Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer added as presider. Senior Judge Charles R. Wolle no longer assigned to case. (sjc)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER. Upon the consent of the parties, and in accordance with the provisions of 28 U.S.C. section 636 (c), the parties waive their right to proceed before a Judge of the United States District Court and consent to have a United States Magistrate Judge conduct any and all further proceedings and order the entry of judgment in this case.Signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Wolle on 4/16/2020. (alb)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER re #5 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN AND CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A MAGISTRATE . A Status Conference is set for 10:00 a.m. on April 29, 2020, by telephone, to discuss the Joint Proposed Scheduling Order (ECF 5) to determine whether parties would prefer a trial date earlier than August 2021. Counsel shall call 1-866-590-5055 and enter code 7013731. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 4/16/2020. (mlr)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PROTECTIVE ORDER adopting #6 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 4/16/2020. (mlr)
April 16, 2020 Filing 6 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc..Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. Responses due by 4/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion for Protective Order)(Murphy, Kerrie)
April 16, 2020 Filing 5 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN AND CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A MAGISTRATE . (Murphy, Kerrie)
March 30, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Murphy, Kerrie)
March 16, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc..(Murphy, Kerrie)
March 12, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number IAS400022368 by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (kjw)
March 12, 2020 Filing 2 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 4/10/2020. (vr)
March 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Rodney L. Lovey from Pottawattamie County, IA, case number LACV120309., filed by Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 6/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (don)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lovely v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust
Represented By: Julie Tomka Bittner
Represented By: Kerrie M Murphy
Represented By: Kerrie M. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Julie Tomka Bittner
Represented By: Kerrie M Murphy
Represented By: Kerrie M. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney L. Lovely
Represented By: Michael G. Reilly
Represented By: Michael G Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?