Friesen et al v. Harvest International, Inc
Plaintiff: Arlyn Friesen and Milford E. Friesen
Defendant: Harvest International, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00014
Filed: April 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: John A Jarvey
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1441pa
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCES. See Order for more particulars. Status Conference set for 8/27/2020 09:30 AM in Phone Hearing(HCA). Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783. Hearing will be held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Status Conference set for 10/29/2020 09:30 AM in Phone Hearing(HCA). Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783. Hearing will be held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Status Conference set for 1/4/2021 09:30 AM in Phone Hearing(HCA). Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783. Hearing will be held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Status Conference set for 3/9/2021 09:30 AM in Phone Hearing(HCA). Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783. Hearing will be held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams.. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 5/29/2020. (imk)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER REGARDING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE REQUIREMENTS. See Order for particulars. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 5/29/2020. (imk)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER adopting #37 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN: Initial Disclosures Deadline 6/30/2020. Motions to Add Parties due by 7/22/2020. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 7/22/2020. Plaintiffs Expert Witness Disclosures due by 8/24/2020. Defendants Expert Witness Disclosures due by 10/26/2020. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Witness Disclosures due by 11/30/2020. Discovery Deadline 12/30/2020. Dispositive Motion Deadline 2/1/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/3/2021 10:00 AM in Des Moines - Room 460 - 4th Floor North before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Jury Trial set for 8/23/2021 09:00 AM in Des Moines - Room 265 - 2nd Floor before Chief Judge John A. Jarvey. Estimated length of seven days. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 5/29/2020. (imk)
May 29, 2020 Filing 38 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams: Scheduling Conference held on 5/29/2020. Attorney William Graham appeared for plaintiff. Attorneys Glenn Johnson and Christine Lebron-Dykeman appeared for defendants. Status of case discussed. Separate Orders to follow. Total Court Time: 9 minutes. (imk)
May 22, 2020 Filing 37 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN . (Graham, William)
May 7, 2020 Filing 36 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Harvest International, Inc.. (Johnson, Glenn)
May 7, 2020 Filing 35 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Arlyn Friesen, Milford E. Friesen by Harvest International, Inc..(Johnson, Glenn)
April 23, 2020 Filing 34 Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 5/7/2020. (don)
April 21, 2020 Filing 33 TEXT ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. A Telephonic Scheduling Conference shall be held on 5/29/2020 at 10:30 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Counsel should call 1-877-336-1829 and enter access code 1176783 at the prompt to be joined with the call. The parties shall file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan as provided under L.R. 16 by 5/22/2020. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 4/21/2020. (imk)
April 16, 2020 Filing 32 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. (Attachments: #1 Transfer Order, #2 Complaint) (kjw)
April 16, 2020 Filing 31 CLERK'S NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS: Your case has been opened in the SDIA and assigned a new case number. Please review the attached document and forms for compliance with this Court's Local Rules. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 7/15/2020. (kjw)
April 16, 2020 Chief Judge John A. Jarvey and Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams added. (vr)
April 16, 2020 Filing 30 Case transferred in from District of Iowa Northern; Case Number 5:19-cv-04072. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 15, 2020 Filing 29 AO 120 Form re Friesen et al v Harvest International Inc mailed to Director of the US Patent and Trademark Office (jag)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER of Case Transfer (see Order text). Signed by Judge Linda R Reade on 4/15/2020. (Case electronically transferred to Southern District of Iowa.) (jag)
February 20, 2020 Filing 27 RESPONSE re #26 APPEAL of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court by Arlyn Friesen, Milford E Friesen by Harvest International, Inc (Johnson, Glenn)
February 6, 2020 Filing 26 APPEAL of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court by Arlyn Friesen, Milford E Friesen (Graham, William)
January 24, 2020 Filing 25 TEXT ORDER denying without prejudice #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Based on the Memorandum and Order (Doc. 24), the court finds the motion for extension should be denied without prejudice to refiling. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 01/24/2020. (KEM)
January 23, 2020 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Friesens #9 motion to remand to state court is denied and Defendant Harvests #8 motion to transfer venue to the Southern District of Iowa is granted. This order shall be stayed for 14 days to allow either party to file objections. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 1/23/2020. (jjh)
January 15, 2020 Filing 23 MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney: Status Conference held on 1/15/2020. (Official Court Record: FTR Gold) (kms)
January 9, 2020 Filing 22 ** TEXT ORDER ONLY ** Resetting Hearing: As agreed to by the parties #21 , Scheduling Conference hearing reset for 1/15/2020 at 10:00 AM (Telephonic Hearing - please see text of Order at #20 for dial-in hearing participation instructions) before Chief United States Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney. Signed by Chief United States Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 01/09/2020. (Gollhofer, Jami) Modified text on 1/10/2020 (kms).
January 9, 2020 Filing 21 MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 1/9/2020. Conference to be rescheduled based on the current posture of the case. Order to follow. (Official Court Record: FTR Gold) (jag)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Setting/Resetting Hearings: Scheduling Conference set for 1/9/2020 at 01:30 PM (Telephonic Hearing - see text of Order for dial-in hearing instructions) before Chief United States Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney. Signed by Chief United States Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 01/09/2020. (Attachments: #1 proposed scheduling order and discovery plan) (Gollhofer, Jami)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #18 Motion to Extend Time To Submit a Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan. Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan due by 1/3/2020. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 12/23/2019. (jag)
December 20, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time Deadline to Submit Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan by Plaintiffs Arlyn Friesen, Milford E Friesen (Graham, William)
December 19, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY BRIEF to re #8 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Harvest International, Inc. (Lebron-Dykeman, Christine)
December 13, 2019 Filing 16 RESISTANCE to Motion re #9 MOTION to Remand filed by Harvest International, Inc. (Lebron-Dykeman, Christine)
December 10, 2019 Reset Deadline as to #9 MOTION to Remand. Defendant's Response now due by 12/13/2019. Action taken per order at #15 . (src)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 UNRESISTED Motion for Extension of Time to Reply re Motion to Transfer filed by Harvest International, Inc, and granting #14 UNRESISTED Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by Harvest International, Inc. Defendant shall have until Wednesday, December 18, 2019 to file a reply to Plaintiffs' resistance to transfer venue. Defendant shall have until Friday, December 13, 2019 to file a response to Plaintiffs' motion to remand. Signed by Judge Linda R Reade on 12/10/2019. (src)
December 10, 2019 Filing 14 UNRESISTED Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by Defendant Harvest International, Inc (Lebron-Dykeman, Christine)
December 10, 2019 Filing 13 UNRESISTED Motion for Extension of Time to Reply re Motion to Transfer by Defendant Harvest International, Inc (Lebron-Dykeman, Christine)
December 4, 2019 Filing 12 RESISTANCE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Change Venue Oral Argument Requested filed by Arlyn Friesen, Milford E Friesen. (Graham, William) Modified text to add oral argument request on 12/5/2019 (kms).
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER - Granting #10 UNRESISTED Motion for Extension of Time to Resist Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Arlyn Friesen, Milford E Friesen. Resistance to #8 MOTION to Change Venue now due by 12/4/2019. Signed by Judge Linda R Reade on 12/02/2019. (src)
November 27, 2019 Filing 10 UNRESISTED Motion for Extension of Time to Resist Motion to Transfer Venue by Plaintiffs Arlyn Friesen, Milford E Friesen (Graham, William)
November 20, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand by Plaintiffs Arlyn Friesen, Milford E Friesen Responses due by 12/4/2019 (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand) (Graham, William)
November 15, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Change Venue by Defendant Harvest International, Inc (Attachments: #1 Brief iso Motion to Transfer, #2 Declaration of Christine Lebron-Dykeman iso Motion to Transfer) (Lebron-Dykeman, Christine)
November 13, 2019 Filing 7 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Harvest International, Inc (Lebron-Dykeman, Christine)- Filed as per KEM Chambers. Modified on 11/13/2019 (jag).
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER to Show Cause. Defendant Harvest International Inc., shall no later than 11/20/2019, show cause why this action was properly removed to this district or take other appropriate action if this action was improperly removed to this district. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 11/6/2019. (src)
November 5, 2019 Filing 5 UNRESISTED Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Removed Petition by Defendant Harvest International, Inc (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Lebron-Dykeman, Christine) Modified on 11/5/2019 to edit text. (src)
October 22, 2019 Set Deadline: Defendant LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 11/12/2019 (des)
October 22, 2019 Filing 4 AO 120 Form re Friesen et al v Harvest International Inc mailed to Director of the US Patent and Trademark Office with a copy of #2 State Court Petition (des)
October 22, 2019 Filing 3 DOCKET Annotation: Please find Civil Removal Actions new case packet attached (des)
October 22, 2019 Filing 2 STATE Court Petition and Jury Demand by Arlyn Friesen, Milford E Friesen (des)
October 22, 2019 Judge Linda R Reade and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney added. No conflicts identified. (des)
October 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Iowa District Court for Montgomery County, case number 04691 LACV 021955. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-3045910), filed by Harvest International, Inc.. Scheduling Report due by 12/20/2019 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1_Original Notice, #3 Exhibit 2_Petition and Jury Demand, #4 Exhibit 3_Acceptance of Service) (Lebron-Dykeman, Christine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Friesen et al v. Harvest International, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arlyn Friesen
Represented By: William W. Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milford E. Friesen
Represented By: William W. Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvest International, Inc.
Represented By: Christine Lebron-Dykeman
Represented By: Glenn L Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?