Couser et al v. Shelby County, Iowa et al
Plaintiff: William Couser and Summit Carbon Solutions, LLC
Defendant: Shelby County, Iowa, Shelby County Board of Supervisors, Steve Kenkel, Charles Parkhurst and Darin Haake
Case Number: 1:2022cv00020
Filed: November 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Stephen B Jackson
Referring Judge: Stephanie M Rose
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 49 U.S.C. ยง 60101 Pipeline Safety Act of 1994
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2022 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint by Darin Haake, Steve Kenkel, Charles Parkhurst, Shelby County Board of Supervisors, Shelby County, Iowa.(Craig, Jason)
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER granting #14 Defendants' Unresisted Motion for Extension of Answer Deadline. Defendants have until December 21, 2022 to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 12/8/2022. (jeb)
December 8, 2022 Filing 14 Unresisted MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Darin Haake, Steve Kenkel, Charles Parkhurst, Shelby County Board of Supervisors, Shelby County, Iowa.Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. (Craig, Jason)
December 5, 2022 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Couser, Summit Carbon Solutions, LLC. Steve Kenkel served on 11/23/2022, answer due 12/14/2022. (Dublinske, Bret)
December 5, 2022 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Couser, Summit Carbon Solutions, LLC. Shelby County, Iowa served on 11/23/2022, answer due 12/14/2022. (Dublinske, Bret)
December 5, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Couser, Summit Carbon Solutions, LLC. Shelby County Board of Supervisors served on 11/23/2022, answer due 12/14/2022. (Dublinske, Bret)
December 5, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Couser, Summit Carbon Solutions, LLC. Darin Haake served on 11/23/2022, answer due 12/14/2022. (Dublinske, Bret)
December 5, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Couser, Summit Carbon Solutions, LLC. Charles Parkhurst served on 11/23/2022, answer due 12/14/2022. (Dublinske, Bret)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Karla M. Doe; granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Michael Roger Hoernlein; granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Brian David Boone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr on 11/30/2022. (btg)
November 28, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by William Couser, Summit Carbon Solutions, LLC. (Dublinske, Bret)
November 28, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by William Couser, Summit Carbon Solutions, LLC. (Dublinske, Bret)
November 28, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by William Couser, Summit Carbon Solutions, LLC. (Dublinske, Bret)
November 22, 2022 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Summit Carbon Solutions, LLC. (Dublinske, Bret)
November 17, 2022 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached corporate disclosure packet in compliance with Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for plaintiff 12/8/2022. (btg)
November 16, 2022 Filing 2 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. (vr)
November 15, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 402, receipt number AIASDC-4980441., filed by William Couser, Summit Carbon Solutions, LLC. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 2/13/2023. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 2/13/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dublinske, Bret)
November 15, 2022 Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr added. Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams no longer assigned to case. Related case 4-22-cv-383. (kjw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Couser et al v. Shelby County, Iowa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Couser
Represented By: Brant Michael Leonard
Represented By: Bret Alan Dublinske
Represented By: Kristy Dahl Rogers
Represented By: Brian David Boone
Represented By: Karla M. Doe
Represented By: Michael Roger Hoernlein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Summit Carbon Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Bret Alan Dublinske
Represented By: Brant Michael Leonard
Represented By: Kristy Dahl Rogers
Represented By: Michael Roger Hoernlein
Represented By: Brian David Boone
Represented By: Karla M. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelby County, Iowa
Represented By: Jason Michael Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelby County Board of Supervisors
Represented By: Jason Michael Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Kenkel
Represented By: Jason Michael Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Parkhurst
Represented By: Jason Michael Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darin Haake
Represented By: Jason Michael Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?