Miller Orthopaedic Affiliates, P.C. v. Stojanovic et al
Plaintiff: Miller Orthopaedic Affiliates, P.C.
Defendant: M.D. Michael Stojanovic, Orthowest LLC, Orthowest LLC also known as Orthowest, P.C. doing business as OrthoNebraska, Michael Stojanovic and Orthowest, P.C.
Case Number: 1:2023cv00034
Filed: November 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: William P Kelly
Referring Judge: Stephen H Locher
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Cody Elyse Brookhouser-Sisney on behalf of Orthowest LLC, Michael Stojanovic (Brookhouser-Sisney, Cody)
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE. A Telephonic Status Conference is set for 7/19/2024 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William P. Kelly. Counsel shall call 1-877-411-9748 and enter code 1376500 to be connected to the call. Signed by Magistrate Judge William P. Kelly on 1/12/2024. (djs)
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REGARDING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE REQUIREMENTS. See Order for particulars. Signed by Magistrate Judge William P. Kelly on 1/12/2024. (Attachments: #1 Supplement FPTO Fillable, #2 Supplement IASD JERS) (djs)
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER adopting #8 REGARDING PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN: Initial Disclosures Deadline 1/31/2024. Motions to Add Parties due by 3/4/2024. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 3/4/2024. Plaintiffs Expert Witness Disclosures due by 4/2/2024. Defendants Expert Witness Disclosures due by 6/3/2024. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Witness Disclosures due by 7/8/2024. A Telephonic Status Conference is set for 7/19/2024 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William P. Kelly. Counsel shall call 1-877-411-9748 and enter code 1376500 to be connected to the call. Discovery Deadline is 8/2/2024. Dispositive Motions Deadline is 9/3/2024. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 1/24/2025 at 11:00 AM via Council Bluffs - Video Proceeding before Judge Stephen H. Locher. Trial Ready by 2/3/2025. Jury Trial is set for 2/3/2025 at 09:00 AM in Council Bluffs before Judge Stephen H. Locher. The estimated length of the trial is 5 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge William P. Kelly on 1/12/2024. (djs)
January 11, 2024 Filing 11 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William P. Kelly: Scheduling Conference held on 1/11/2024. Attorney Nicole Seckman Jilek appeared for Plaintiff. Attorneys Aaron A. Clark and Ruth A. Horvatich appeared for Defendants. Status of the case was discussed. Separate Orders to follow. Total Court Time: 22 minutes. (djs)
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER RESETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is RESET for 1/11/2024 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William P. Kelly. Counsel shall call 1-877-411-9748 and enter code 1376500 at the prompt to join the call. Signed by Magistrate Judge William P. Kelly on 1/8/2024.(rls) Modified on 1/8/2024 to correct time (rls).
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER CONTINUING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Due to inclement weather and court closure, the Scheduling Conference currently set for tomorrow, January 9, 2024, at 10:00 AM is continued until further Order of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge William P. Kelly on 1/8/2024. (rls)
December 29, 2023 Filing 8 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN . (Seckman Jilek, Nicole)
December 26, 2023 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Orthowest LLC. (Clark, Aaron)
December 15, 2023 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Miller Orthopaedic Affiliates, P.C.. (Seckman Jilek, Nicole)
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 1/9/2024 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William P. Kelly. Counsel shall call 1-877-411-9748 and enter code 1376500 to be connected to the call. The parties shall file a Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan as provided in Local Rule 16 by 1/2/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge William P. Kelly on 12/5/2023. (djs)
December 5, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines: Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendants 12/26/2023. (nla)
December 4, 2023 Filing 4 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) and Jury Demand by Orthowest LLC, Michael Stojanovic.(Clark, Aaron)
November 28, 2023 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Local Rule 81 re #1 Notice of Removal, by Orthowest LLC, Michael Stojanovic. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Filing #1 - Original Notice, #2 Exhibit Filing #2 - Petition, #3 Exhibit Filing #3 - Order for Individual Case Assignment, #4 Exhibit Filing #4 - Original Notice, #5 Exhibit Filing #5 - Amended Petition, #6 Exhibit Filing #6 - Entry of Appearance, #7 Exhibit Filing #7 - Motion to Withdraw as Counsel, #8 Exhibit Filing #8 - Order Granting Withdraw as Counsel, #9 Exhibit Filing #9 - Original Notice, #10 Exhibit Filing #10 - Return of Original Notice, #11 Exhibit Filing #11 - Return of Service-Other, #12 Exhibit Filling #12 - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Clark, Aaron)
November 28, 2023 Filing 2 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure deadline set for 12/19/23 for all parties (Attachments: #1 7.1 Packet) (nla) Modified on 11/28/2023, set deadline (kjw).
November 27, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Orthowest LLC, Michael Stojanovic from Pottawattamie County District, case number LACV 124368. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 402, receipt number AIASDC-5305504., filed by Orthowest LLC, Michael Stojanovic. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 2/26/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Pleadings)(Clark, Aaron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller Orthopaedic Affiliates, P.C. v. Stojanovic et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miller Orthopaedic Affiliates, P.C.
Represented By: Nichole Seckman Jilek
Represented By: Nicole Seckman Jilek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. Michael Stojanovic
Represented By: Aaron A Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orthowest LLC
Represented By: Aaron A Clark
Represented By: Abigail M. Moland
Represented By: Ruth A Horvatich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orthowest LLC also known as Orthowest, P.C. doing business as OrthoNebraska
Represented By: Aaron A Clark
Represented By: Abigail M. Moland
Represented By: Cody Elyse Brookhouser-Sisney
Represented By: Ruth A Horvatich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Stojanovic
Represented By: Aaron A Clark
Represented By: Abigail M. Moland
Represented By: Cody Elyse Brookhouser-Sisney
Represented By: Ruth A Horvatich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orthowest, P.C.
Represented By: Aaron A Clark
Represented By: Abigail M. Moland
Represented By: Cody Elyse Brookhouser-Sisney
Represented By: Ruth A Horvatich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?