Hammes v. City of Davenport, Iowa
Plaintiff: Jesse J. Hammes
Defendant: City of Davenport, Iowa
Case Number: 3:2018cv00111
Filed: November 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Stephen B Jackson
Referring Judge: Stephanie M Rose
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331pd
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #3 Defendant's Motion for Additional Time to Move or Plead. Plaintiff Jesse J. Hammes' response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #5 and Brief #6 due by January 11, 2019. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 12/20/2018. (jeb)
December 19, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE re Pleasant Creek Stability Analysis by Jesse J. Hammes. [Duplicative of attachment to Pleading 7] (rmj)
December 19, 2018 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of #3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by City of Davenport, Iowa. (Davidson, Richard)
December 19, 2018 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint MOTION for Extension of Time to File filed by Jesse J. Hammes. Replies due by 12/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support) (rmj)
December 10, 2018 Filing 6 BRIEF by City of Davenport, Iowa in Support of Motion to Dismiss. (Davidson, Richard) Modified on 12/15/2018, linked to motion #5 (kjw).
December 10, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by City of Davenport, Iowa. Responses due by 12/24/2018. (Davidson, Richard)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER RE: #3 Defendant's Motion for Additional Time to Move or Plead. Defendant to serve motion on plaintiff and file amended certificate of service. Deadline for plaintiff Jesse J. Hammes to respond to motion #3 set for December 21, 2018. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 12/4/2018. (jeb)
November 29, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint , MOTION for Extension of Time to File by City of Davenport, Iowa.Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Responses due by 12/13/2018. (Davidson, Richard)
November 27, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jesse J. Hammes. City of Davenport, Iowa, served on 11/5/2018, answer due 11/26/2018. (dmh)
November 2, 2018 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number IAS300001116 for Civil Filing Fee paid by Jesse J. Hammes. (dmh)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND REQUEST FOR INJUNCTION filed by Jesse J. Hammes against the City of Davenport, Iowa. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 1/31/2019. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 1/31/2019. (dmh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hammes v. City of Davenport, Iowa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Davenport, Iowa
Represented By: Richard A Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse J. Hammes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?