Needham Excavating, Inc. v. Trustees of the International Union of Operating Engineers Local 150 et al

Plaintiff: Needham Excavating, Inc.
Defendant: Trustees of the Retirement Enhancement Fund, Trustees of the Vacation Savings Plan, Trustees of the Retiree Welfare Plan, Trustees of the Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Pension Trust Fund and Trustees of the International Union of Operating Engineers Local 150
Case Number: 3:2018cv00116
Filed: November 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
0 Judge: Stephen B Jackson
1 Judge: John A Jarvey
2 Judge: Robert W Pratt
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2019 Filing 22 Errata re #1 Complaint,, filed by Needham Excavating, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Errata Exhibits)(Niew, Stanley)
January 11, 2019 Set Deadline: Status Report due by 2/22/2019. (bp)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT ORDER granting #20 Joint Motion to Stay Proceedings. For the resons set forth by the parties, the proceedings in this case shall be stayed until February 22, 2019. The parties shall file a joint status report as to the matters before the Joint Panel on Multidistrict Litigation by no later than February 22, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 1/10/2019. (jeb)
January 8, 2019 Filing 20 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Trustees of the International Union of Operating Engineers Local 150, Trustees of the Pension Trust Fund, Trustees of the Retiree Welfare Plan, Trustees of the Retirement Enhancement Fund, Trustees of the Vacation Savings Plan, Trustees of the Welfare Fund.Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Responses due by 1/22/2019. (LaRose, Elizabeth)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Robert A. Paszta. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr on 1/4/2019. (slg)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER granting #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Dale D. Pierson; granting #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Elizabeth A. LaRose. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr on 12/27/2018. (slg)
December 23, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3683964 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Trustees of the International Union of Operating Engineers Local 150, Trustees of the Pension Trust Fund, Trustees of the Retiree Welfare Plan, Trustees of the Retirement Enhancement Fund, Trustees of the Vacation Savings Plan, Trustees of the Welfare Fund. (Hedberg, Mark)
December 23, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3683963 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Trustees of the International Union of Operating Engineers Local 150, Trustees of the Pension Trust Fund, Trustees of the Retiree Welfare Plan, Trustees of the Retirement Enhancement Fund, Trustees of the Vacation Savings Plan, Trustees of the Welfare Fund. (Hedberg, Mark)
December 23, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3683962 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Trustees of the International Union of Operating Engineers Local 150, Trustees of the Pension Trust Fund, Trustees of the Retiree Welfare Plan, Trustees of the Retirement Enhancement Fund, Trustees of the Vacation Savings Plan, Trustees of the Welfare Fund. (Hedberg, Mark)
December 23, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark T Hedberg on behalf of All Defendants (Hedberg, Mark)
December 21, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE by Needham Excavating, Inc. NOTICE OF FILING (Attachments: #1 MOTION FOR TRANSFER AND CONSOLIDATION OF ACTIONS)(Niew, Stanley)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting #11 Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead. As requested, defendants shall have util January 18, 2019, to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 12/10/2018. (jeb)
December 10, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer or Plead by Trustees of the International Union of Operating Engineers Local 150, Trustees of the Pension Trust Fund, Trustees of the Retiree Welfare Plan, Trustees of the Retirement Enhancement Fund, Trustees of the Vacation Savings Plan, Trustees of the Welfare Fund.Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Responses due by 12/24/2018. (Hedberg, Mark)
December 6, 2018 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Needham Excavating, Inc.. (Niew, Stanley)
November 29, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Needham Excavating, Inc.. Trustees of the Retirement Enhancement Fund served on 11/28/2018, answer due 12/19/2018. (Niew, Stanley)
November 29, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Needham Excavating, Inc.. Trustees of the Vacation Savings Plan served on 11/28/2018, answer due 12/19/2018. (Niew, Stanley)
November 29, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Needham Excavating, Inc.. Trustees of the Retiree Welfare Plan served on 11/28/2018, answer due 12/19/2018. (Niew, Stanley)
November 29, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Needham Excavating, Inc.. Trustees of the Welfare Fund served on 11/28/2018, answer due 12/19/2018. (Niew, Stanley)
November 29, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Needham Excavating, Inc.. Trustees of the Pension Trust Fund served on 11/28/2018, answer due 12/19/2018. (Niew, Stanley)
November 29, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Needham Excavating, Inc.. Trustees of the International Union of Operating Engineers Local 150 served on 11/28/2018, answer due 12/19/2018. (Niew, Stanley)
November 26, 2018 Chief Judge John A. Jarvey added. Senior Judge Robert W. Pratt no longer assigned to case. (bp)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Stanley E. Niew. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr on 11/21/2018. (kjw)
November 21, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3656694 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Needham Excavating, Inc.. (Driscoll, Kevin)
November 21, 2018 Set Deadline: Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for plaintiff 12/11/2018. (bp)
November 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Trustees of the International Union of Operating Engineers Local 150, Trustees of the Pension Trust Fund, Trustees of the Retiree Welfare Plan, Trustees of the Retirement Enhancement Fund, Trustees of the Vacation Savings Plan, Trustees of the Welfare Fund Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3655571., filed by Needham Excavating, Inc.. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 2/19/2019. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 2/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 Settlement Agreement, #2 Exhibit Ex 2, #3 Exhibit Ex 3, #4 Exhibit Ex 4)(Driscoll, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Needham Excavating, Inc. v. Trustees of the International Union of Operating Engineers Local 150 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Needham Excavating, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin J Driscoll
Represented By: Stanley E Niew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustees of the Retirement Enhancement Fund
Represented By: Mark T Hedberg
Represented By: Elizabeth A LaRose
Represented By: Robert A Paszta
Represented By: Dale D Pierson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustees of the Vacation Savings Plan
Represented By: Mark T Hedberg
Represented By: Elizabeth A LaRose
Represented By: Robert A Paszta
Represented By: Dale D Pierson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustees of the Retiree Welfare Plan
Represented By: Mark T Hedberg
Represented By: Elizabeth A LaRose
Represented By: Robert A Paszta
Represented By: Dale D Pierson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustees of the Welfare Fund
Represented By: Mark T Hedberg
Represented By: Elizabeth A LaRose
Represented By: Robert A Paszta
Represented By: Dale D Pierson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustees of the Pension Trust Fund
Represented By: Mark T Hedberg
Represented By: Elizabeth A LaRose
Represented By: Robert A Paszta
Represented By: Dale D Pierson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustees of the International Union of Operating Engineers Local 150
Represented By: Mark T Hedberg
Represented By: Elizabeth A LaRose
Represented By: Robert A Paszta
Represented By: Dale D Pierson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?