Stoneking et al v. Menard Inc

Plaintiff: Mary R. Stoneking and Victor E. Stoneking
Defendant: Menard Inc and Menard, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00118
Filed: November 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
0 Judge: Celeste F Bremer
1 Judge: John A Jarvey
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Menard, Inc..(Abernathy, Terry)
December 3, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Menard Inc. (Abernathy, Terry)
November 29, 2018 Set Deadlines: Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 12/21/2018. (rmj)
November 29, 2018 Filing 3 PUBLIC DOCKET ANNOTATION: It appears Local Rule 7.1 applies in this case. Attached is this Court's 7.1 packet. Defendant's deadline is set accordingly by the Clerk's Office. (rmj)
November 29, 2018 Filing 2 STATEMENT of Filing Pursuant to Local Rule 81(a) by Menard Inc. (Abernathy, Terry)
November 29, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Menard Inc from Iowa District Court for Des Moines County, case number LALA005117. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3662979., filed by Menard Inc. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 2/25/2019.(Abernathy, Terry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stoneking et al v. Menard Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menard Inc
Represented By: Bradley J. Kaspar
Represented By: Terry J Abernathy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menard, Inc.
Represented By: Bradley J. Kaspar
Represented By: Terry J Abernathy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary R. Stoneking
Represented By: Andrew Mahoney
Represented By: Steven J Crowley
Represented By: Edward J Prill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor E. Stoneking
Represented By: Andrew Mahoney
Represented By: Steven J Crowley
Represented By: Edward J Prill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?