Stoner v. State of Iowa et al

Plaintiff: Ronald Keith Stoner
Defendant: State Police Officer, Other Individual Persons, State of Iowa, State of Indiana, Thomas Bredewig and Robert Griffith
Case Number: 3:2018cv00122
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: Iowa Southern District Court
0 Judge: Helen C Adams
1 Judge: Charles R Wolle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 6, 2018 Senior Judge Charles R. Wolle added. Senior Judge James E. Gritzner no longer assigned to case. (kjw)
December 6, 2018 Senior Judge James E. Gritzner and Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams added. (kjw)
December 6, 2018 8 Case transferred in from District of Indiana Southern; Case Number 2:18-cv-00484. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 6, 2018 7 Transfer Letter to Clerk of the Southern District of Iowa. Case transferred electronically to Southern District of Iowa, on December 6, 2018. (DMW)
December 6, 2018 6 Featured Case CLOSED TRANSFER to Southern District of Iowa, Central Division, at Des Moines, Iowa. Nearly all of the events alleged in the Complaint occurred in Iowa, and all of the defendants but the State of Indiana reside there. Because the plaintiff's claims against the State of Indiana are likely barred by Eleventh Amendment sovereign immunity, the core of the Complaint that could proceed in this action will proceed only against Iowa defendants. (See Order.) Copy to Plaintiff via U.S. Mail. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 12/6/2018. (DMW)
December 3, 2018 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against THOMAS BREDEWIG, STATE OF INDIANA, STATE OF IOWA, ROBERT GRIFFITH, STATE POLICE OFFICER, filed by RONALD KEITH STONER. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(DMW)
November 1, 2018 4 Entry Granting Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and Dismissing Complaint - The plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis, Dkt. No. #2 , is granted. Notwithstanding the foregoing ruling, the plaintiff still owes the entire filing fee. The plaintiff shall have through November 26, 2018, in which to file an amended complaint. The amended complaint will completely replace the original complaint and therefore must be complete. The amended complaint must have the words "Amended Complaint" and the proper case number, No. 2:18-cv-00484-WTL-MJD, on the first page. If an amended complaint is filed, it will be screened. If no amended complaint is filed by the above deadline, the action will be dismissed as legally insufficient. (See Entry.) Copy to Plaintiff via U.S. Mail. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 11/1/2018. (DMW)
October 29, 2018 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (HET)
October 29, 2018 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff RONALD KEITH STONER. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(HET)
October 29, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against THOMAS J. BREDEWEG, OTHER INDIVIDUAL PERSONS, STATE OF INDIANA, STATE OF IOWA, filed by RONALD KEITH STONER. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(HET)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stoner v. State of Iowa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Police Officer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Other Individual Persons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Iowa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Indiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Bredewig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Keith Stoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?