Hendricks v. Marsh & McLennan Companies, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Richard D. Hendricks
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America and Marsh & McLennan Companies, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00128
Filed: December 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
0 Judge: Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger
1 Judge: Stephen B Jackson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1055
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated, per Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice #7 . (bp)
February 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Marsh & McLennan Companies, Inc. (Dralle, Angela)
January 28, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Marsh & McLennan Companies, Inc.. (Dralle, Angela)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Unresisted Motion for Second Extension of Time for Marsh & McLennan Companies, Inc. to Respond to the Petition. As requested, defendant Marsh & McLennan Companies, Inc. shall have until February 15, 2019, to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 1/23/2019. (jeb)
January 23, 2019 Filing 4 Unresisted MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Response to Petition by Marsh & McLennan Companies, Inc..Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Responses due by 2/6/2019. (Dralle, Angela)
December 28, 2018 Set Deadline: Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendants 1/28/2019. (bp)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ORDER granting #2 Defendant Marsh & McLennan Companies, Inc.'s Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Petition. Defendant's answer to the Petition is due 1/31/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr on 12/27/2018. (dm)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or to Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's state court Petition in this forum by Marsh & McLennan Companies, Inc..Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. (Dralle, Angela)
December 27, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Marsh & McLennan Companies, Inc. from Iowa District Court for Scott County, case number LACE 130986. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3685388., filed by Marsh & McLennan Companies, Inc.. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 3/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Statement Pursuant to Local Rule 81(a), #2 Exhibit State Court Pleadings)(Dralle, Angela)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hendricks v. Marsh & McLennan Companies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Kerrie M Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marsh & McLennan Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Angela Ellen Dralle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard D. Hendricks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?