Johnson v. Wetsch Abbott Osborn Van Vliet PLC

Plaintiff: Joy Johnson
Defendant: Wetsch Abbott Osborn Van Vliet PLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00006
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Stephen B Jackson
Referring Judge: Robert W Pratt
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY Brief re #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Wetsch Abbott Osborn Van Vliet PLC.(Stanley, Andrew)
February 27, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Brief in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Joy Johnson. Replies due by 3/6/2019.(Johnson, Jesse)
February 13, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by Wetsch Abbott Osborn Van Vliet PLC. Responses due by 2/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Stanley, Andrew)
February 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew M Stanley on behalf of Wetsch Abbott Osborn Van Vliet PLC (Stanley, Andrew)
February 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin J Driscoll on behalf of Wetsch Abbott Osborn Van Vliet PLC (Driscoll, Kevin)
January 24, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joy Johnson. Wetsch Abbott Osborn Van Vliet PLC served on 1/23/2019, answer due 2/13/2019. (Johnson, Jesse)
January 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric David Puryear on behalf of Joy Johnson (Puryear, Eric)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jesse S. Johnson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr on 1/18/2019. (kjw)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3705844 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Joy Johnson. (Johnson, Jesse)
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Joy Johnson re #1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet (Mail, Eric)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint against WETSCH ABBOTT OSBORN VAN VLIET PLC, Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3705681., filed by Joy Johnson. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 4/18/2019. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 4/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - Nov 14 Communication to Plaintiff)(Mail, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Wetsch Abbott Osborn Van Vliet PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wetsch Abbott Osborn Van Vliet PLC
Represented By: Kevin J Driscoll
Represented By: Andrew M Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joy Johnson
Represented By: Jesse Stine Johnson
Represented By: Eric Steven Mail
Represented By: Eric David Puryear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?