Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Cream, LLC., et al

Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc., Songs of Universal Inc., BMG Rights Management, Ghostown Thang Music, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Ground Control Music, Carl Mo Music, Sally Ruth Esther Publishing Inc., NU Shooz Orchestra LLC and Fall Out Boy Inc.
Defendant: George W. Wittgraf, III, Cream LLC and Victoria S. Wittgraf
Case Number: 3:2019cv00007
Filed: January 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Celeste F Bremer
Referring Judge: Stephanie M Rose
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint and Jury Demand by Cream LLC, George W. Wittgraf, III, Victoria S. Wittgraf.(Charles, David)
February 13, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Sony/ATV Songs LLC. (Harty, Jeffrey)
February 13, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Songs of Universal Inc.. (Harty, Jeffrey)
February 13, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Sally Ruth Esther Publishing Inc.. (Harty, Jeffrey)
February 13, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by NU Shooz Orchestra LLC. (Harty, Jeffrey)
February 13, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Ground Control Music. (Harty, Jeffrey)
February 13, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Ghostown Thang Music. (Harty, Jeffrey)
February 13, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Fall Out Boy Inc.. (Harty, Jeffrey)
February 13, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by EMI Blackwood Music, Inc.. (Harty, Jeffrey)
February 13, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Carl Mo Music. (Harty, Jeffrey)
February 13, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by BMG Rights Management. (Harty, Jeffrey)
February 13, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Broadcast Music, Inc.. (Harty, Jeffrey)
February 12, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Broadcast Music, Inc.. George W. Wittgraf, III served on 1/28/2019, answer due 2/19/2019. (Harty, Jeffrey)
February 1, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Broadcast Music, Inc.. Victoria S. Wittgraf served on 1/24/2019, answer due 2/14/2019. (Harty, Jeffrey)
February 1, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Broadcast Music, Inc.. Cream LLC served on 1/24/2019, answer due 2/14/2019. (Harty, Jeffrey)
January 24, 2019 Filing 2 REPORT REGARDING COPYRIGHT mailed to registrar. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (kmc)
January 23, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for plaintiffs' 2/12/2019. (kmc)
January 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3707288., filed by Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Songs of Universal Inc., Sally Ruth Esther Publishing Inc., EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Fall Out Boy Inc. d/b/a Chicago X Softcore Songs, Ground Control Music, Broadcast Music, Inc., Ghostown Thang Music, Carl Mo Music, BMG Rights Management d/b/a BMG Bumblee, NU Shooz Orchestra LLC. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 4/22/2019. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 4/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Harty, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Cream, LLC., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey D Harty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Songs of Universal Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey D Harty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BMG Rights Management
Represented By: Jeffrey D Harty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ghostown Thang Music
Represented By: Jeffrey D Harty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony/ATV Songs LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey D Harty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMI Blackwood Music, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey D Harty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ground Control Music
Represented By: Jeffrey D Harty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Mo Music
Represented By: Jeffrey D Harty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sally Ruth Esther Publishing Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey D Harty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NU Shooz Orchestra LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey D Harty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fall Out Boy Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey D Harty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George W. Wittgraf, III
Represented By: David L Charles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cream LLC
Represented By: David L Charles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victoria S. Wittgraf
Represented By: David L Charles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?