Schlatter v. Allied Blending L.P. et al

Plaintiff: Audrey Schlatter Schlatter and Audrey Schlatter
Defendant: J. Rettenmaier America, Inc., Darlene Young, Randy Schmelzel, J. Rettenmaier USA LP, Allied Blending L.P. and Allied Blending & Ingredients, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00008
Filed: January 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: Stephanie M Rose
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2617
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCES. See order for more particulars. Status Conference set for 8/21/2019 10:00 AM in Phone Hearing before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Status Conference set for 10/21/2019 10:00 AM in Phone Hearing before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Status Conference set for 12/18/2019 10:00 AM in Phone Hearing before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Status Conference set for 2/21/2020 10:00 AM in Phone Hearing before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Status Conference set for 4/20/2020 10:00 AM in Phone Hearing before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Status Conference set for 6/18/2020 10:00 AM in Phone Hearing before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Status Conference set for 8/26/2020 10:00 AM in Phone Hearing before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams.. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 3/29/2019. (imk)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REGARDING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE REQUIREMENTS. See order for particulars. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 3/29/2019. (imk)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER adopting #16 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN: Initial Disclosures Deadline 4/12/2019. Motions to Add Parties due by 7/25/2019. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 7/25/2019. Plaintiffs Expert Witness Disclosures due by 8/26/2019. Defendants Expert Witness Disclosures due by 10/25/2019. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Witness Disclosures due by 11/25/2019. Discovery Deadline 2/27/2020. Dispositive Motion Deadline 3/27/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/9/2020 10:00 AM in Des Moines Courthouse before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Jury Trial set for 11/2/2020 09:00 AM in Davenport Courthouse before Judge Stephanie M. Rose. Estimated length of five days. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 3/29/2019. (imk)
March 29, 2019 Filing 17 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams: Scheduling Conference held on 3/29/2019. Attorney Whitney Judkins appeared for plaintiff. Attorney Frances Haas appeared for defendant. Status of case discussed. Separate orders to follow. Total Court Time: 11 minutes. (imk)
March 21, 2019 Filing 16 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN . (Attachments: #1 Supplement Addendum to Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan)(Haas, Frances)
March 7, 2019 Filing 15 TEXT ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. A Scheduling Conference shall be held on 3/29/2019 at 10:00 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams in Room 420 at the Des Moines Courthouse. Counsel outside of Des Moines may attend telephonically. If they choose to do so, counsel should call 1-877-336-1829 and enter access code 1176783 at the prompt to be joined with the call. The parties shall file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan as provided under L.R. 16 by 3/25/2019. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 3/7/2019. (imk)
March 6, 2019 Filing 14 Defendant Allied Blending L.P.'s Answer and Affirmative Defenses Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Allied Blending L.P..(Olson, Ethan)
March 6, 2019 Filing 13 Defendants J. Rettenmaier America, Inc. and J. Rettenmaier USA LP's Answer and Affirmative Defenses Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by J. Rettenmaier America, Inc., J. Rettenmaier USA LP.(Olson, Ethan)
March 1, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER to of the Service of Summons Randy Schmelzel by Allied Blending L.P., J. Rettenmaier America, Inc., J. Rettenmaier USA LP, Allied Blending & Ingredients, Inc., Randy Schmelzel. (Olson, Ethan)
March 1, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER to of the Service of Summons Darlene Young by Allied Blending L.P., J. Rettenmaier America, Inc., J. Rettenmaier USA LP, Allied Blending & Ingredients, Inc., Darlene Young. (Olson, Ethan)
February 27, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by J. Rettenmaier America, Inc.. (Olson, Ethan)
February 27, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by J. Rettenmaier USA LP. (Olson, Ethan)
February 27, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Allied Blending L.P.. (Olson, Ethan)
February 26, 2019 Filing 7 **Filed in Error** Waiver to be filed. SUMMONS Returned Executed. Darlene Young served on 2/26/2019, answer due 3/19/2019. (Judkins, Whitney) Modified on 2/27/2019 (rmj).
February 26, 2019 Filing 6 *Filed in Error* Waiver to be filed SUMMONS Returned. Randy Schmelzel served on 2/26/2019, answer due 3/19/2019. (Judkins, Whitney) Modified on 2/27/2019 (rmj).
February 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Audrey Schlatter dismissing Allied Blending & Ingredients, Inc.. (Judkins, Whitney)
February 5, 2019 Set Deadlines: Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendants 2/28/2019. (bp)
January 31, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall have until 3/7/2019 to file their Answer or responsive motion. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 1/31/2019. (imk)
January 31, 2019 Filing 3 Unresisted MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,,, Unresisted Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to Amended Petition and Jury Demand by Allied Blending L.P., J. Rettenmaier America, Inc., J. Rettenmaier USA LP.Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. (Olson, Ethan)
January 31, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached corporate disclosure packet. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. (bp)
January 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allied Blending L.P., J. Rettenmaier America, Inc., J. Rettenmaier USA LP from Iowa District Court for Lee County, case number LALA006469. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3715365., filed by Allied Blending L.P., J. Rettenmaier America, Inc., J. Rettenmaier USA LP. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 4/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A to notice of removal, #2 Exhibit Ex. B to notice of removal, #3 Exhibit Ex. C to notice of removal, #4 Exhibit Ex. D to notice of removal, #5 Exhibit Ex. E to notice of removal, #6 Exhibit Ex. F to notice of removal, #7 Exhibit Ex. G to notice of removal, #8 Exhibit Ex. H to notice of removal, #9 Exhibit Ex. I to notice of removal, #10 Exhibit Ex. J to notice of removal, #11 Exhibit Ex. K to notice of removal, #12 Exhibit Ex. L to notice of removal, #13 Supplement Local Rule 81(a) Statement)(Haas, Frances)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schlatter v. Allied Blending L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Rettenmaier America, Inc.
Represented By: Frances M. Haas
Represented By: Ethan S. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darlene Young
Represented By: Ethan S. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Schmelzel
Represented By: Ethan S. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Rettenmaier USA LP
Represented By: Frances M. Haas
Represented By: Ethan S. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Blending L.P.
Represented By: Frances M. Haas
Represented By: Ethan S. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Blending & Ingredients, Inc.
Represented By: Ethan S. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audrey Schlatter Schlatter
Represented By: Brooke C Timmer
Represented By: Whitney C. Judkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audrey Schlatter
Represented By: Brooke C Timmer
Represented By: Whitney C. Judkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?