Simpson v. The Standard Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Jeffrey B Simpson
Defendant: Standard Insurance Company and The Standard Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00016
Filed: February 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
0 Judge: Celeste F Bremer
1 Judge: Stephen B Jackson
2 Judge: John A Jarvey
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer added. Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr no longer assigned to case. (don)
February 12, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint , Standard Insurance Company's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Standard Insurance Company.(Herring, Jacqueline)
February 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacqueline J. Herring on behalf of Standard Insurance Company (Herring, Jacqueline)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jacqueline J. Herring. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr on 2/8/2019. (slg)
February 7, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3725724 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Standard Insurance Company. (Herring, Jacqueline)
February 6, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Standard Insurance Company. (Hinz, Stephanie)
February 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Standard Insurance Company from Iowa District Court in and for Scott County, case number LACE131172. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3724331., filed by Standard Insurance Company. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 5/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Filing Pursuant to Local Rule 81(a))(Hinz, Stephanie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simpson v. The Standard Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey B Simpson
Represented By: Stephen T Fieweger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Insurance Company
Represented By: Stephanie L Hinz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Standard Insurance Company
Represented By: Jacqueline J. Herring
Represented By: Stephanie L Hinz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?