Victory Boxing Promotions v. Ennis
Plaintiff: Victory Boxing Promotions
Defendant: Jaron Ennis
Case Number: 3:2019cv00031
Filed: March 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Celeste F Bremer
Referring Judge: Robert W Pratt
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446bc
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 TEXT ORDER SETTING NEXT STATUS CONFERENCE AND RESETTING DEADLINES. Court sets next Status Conference for 10/8/2019 at 09:30 AM via Phone Hearing before Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer. Counsel shall call 1-866-590-5055 and enter access code 7013731 at the prompt. Counsel shall file a joint agenda by no later than 4:00 p.m. on 10/4/2019. Court resets the following deadlines: Motions to Add Parties due by 8/30/2019. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 8/30/2019. Plaintiffs Expert Witness Disclosures due by 10/15/2019. Defendants Expert Witness Disclosures due by 12/13/2019. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Witness Disclosures due by 1/6/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 7/10/2019. (mel)
July 10, 2019 Filing 26 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer: Status Conference held on 7/10/2019. (mel)
July 9, 2019 Filing 25 STATUS REPORT Joint Agenda for July 10 Status Conference by Victory Boxing Promotions. (Burns, Paul)
July 1, 2019 Filing 24 Plaintiff's ANSWER to #23 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Counterclaim by Victory Boxing Promotions.(Burns, Paul)
June 14, 2019 Filing 23 Defendant's Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , COUNTERCLAIM against Victory Boxing Promotions by Jaron Ennis.(Streit, Michael)
June 5, 2019 Set Hearings: Ten-day Jury Trial set for 8/17/2020 - 8/28/2020 09:00 AM in Davenport - Room 242 - 2nd Floor before Senior Judge Robert W. Pratt. (bp)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEXT ORDER re #20 . A Status Conference is set for 11:30 a.m. on July 10, 2019, before the undersigned. Counsel shall call 1-866-590-5055 and enter code 7013731 at the prompt. By 4:00 p.m. on July 3, 2019, counsel shall file a Joint Agenda. If there are no issues to be discussed, they may request the Status Conference be canceled. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 6/4/2019. (mlr)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Ten-day Jury trial set before the Honorable Robert W. Pratt at 9:00 a.m. on August 17, 2020, at the U.S. Courthouse in Davenport, Iowa. Final Pretrial Conference set before the undersigned at 10:00 a.m. on August 3, 2020. See Order #20 for instructions to the parties regarding requirements for Final Pretrial Conferences. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 6/4/2019. (mlr)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER adopting #19 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN: Ten-day Jury Trial set for 8/17/2020 09:00 AM in Davenport - Room 120 - 1st Floor before Senior Judge Robert W. Pratt. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/3/2020 10:00 AM in Phone Hearing. Counsel shall call 1-866-590-5055 and enter code 7013731 at the prompt. Status Conference set for 7/10/2019 at 11:30 AM in Phone Hearing before Magistrate Judge Bremer. Counsel shall call 1-866-590-5055 and enter code 7013731 at the prompt. Initial Disclosures Deadline 7/1/2019. Motions to Add Parties due by 7/31/2019. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 7/31/2019. Plaintiffs Expert Witness Disclosures due by 8/30/2019. Defendants Expert Witness Disclosures due by 10/30/2019. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Witness Disclosures due by 11/29/2019. Discovery Deadline 1/30/2020. Dispositive Motion Deadline 3/2/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 6/4/2019. (mlr)
June 3, 2019 Filing 19 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN . (Burns, Paul)
May 31, 2019 Filing 18 WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Jaron Ennis #13 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,. (Hellstern, David)
May 23, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE by Jaron Ennis of the Withdrawal of John S. Wirt, Esq. as counsel of record for Defendant (Wirt, John)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim : Motion Hearing set for 6/5/2019 10:00 AM in Des Moines - Room 455 - 4th Floor South before Senior Judge Robert W. Pratt.. Signed by Senior Judge Robert W. Pratt on 5/17/2019. (mlm)
May 13, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim filed by Jaron Ennis. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Of John S. Wirt, Esq.)(Wirt, John)
May 6, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim Plaintiff's Brief in Resistance to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Victory Boxing Promotions. Replies due by 5/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Certified Statement of Christopher Middendorf, #2 Exhibit 1 to Attachment of Certified Statement of Christopher Middendorf, #3 Exhibit 2 to Attachment of Certified Statement of Christopher Middendorf)(Burns, Paul)
April 22, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim by Jaron Ennis. Responses due by 5/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit OF JARON ENNIS, #2 Affidavit OF DEREK ENNIS, SR., #3 Affidavit OF JOSEPH DUNKIN, #4 Affidavit OF THOMAS MORAN, #5 Affidavit OF JOHN S. WIRT, ESQ., #6 Affidavit OF CAMERON DUNKIN)(Wirt, John)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER denying Defendant's #10 Motion to Expedite Discovery from Non-parties. The Court does not require a Response from Plaintiff. See L.R. 7(c). The parties have not conferred as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f), and Defendant has not shown any urgency in his need to obtain documents from non-parties on or before April 16, 2019, in response to subpoenas duces tecum issued April 9, 2019. This case was filed in the Iowa District Court for Johnson County on March 5, 2019, and removed to this court on March 27, 2019. Defendant has not shown any urgency for early discovery, or any expedited relief, before the parties submit a Proposed Scheduling Order. The Rules require counsel to meet-and-confer to narrow or resolve discovery issues, and to determine an appropriate schedule for pretrial matters in order to discourage wasteful pretrial activities, and to ensure the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action. ALL counsel shall cooperate in scheduling such conferences, which will allow the case to be determined on its merits. Do not make work on issues that can be easily resolved with a conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 4/15/2019. (cfb)
April 15, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Jaron Ennis. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal, #4 Initial Review Order AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL (ECF 1) PER COURT ORDER (ECF 4). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit IOWA STATE ACTION (JOHNSON COUNTY))(Wirt, John)
April 13, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Expedite AND FOR LEAVE TO CONDUCT EARLY DISCOVERY by Jaron Ennis.Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. Responses due by 4/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit OF JOHN S. WIRT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO CONDUCT EARLY DISCOVERY)(Wirt, John)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Michael S. Miller. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 4/8/2019. (slg)
April 8, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3786784 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Victory Boxing Promotions. (Burns, Paul)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice John S. Wirt. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 4/8/2019. (slg)
April 7, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3786634 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Jaron Ennis. (Wirt, John)
April 4, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Victory Boxing Promotions. (Burns, Paul)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL REVIEW ORDER re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Jaron Ennis. Amended Notice of Removal due by 4/15/2019. Signed by Senior Judge Robert W. Pratt on 4/4/2019. (klw)
April 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul David Burns on behalf of Victory Boxing Promotions (Burns, Paul)
March 28, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for plaintiff 4/17/2019. (slg)
March 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jaron Ennis from Iowa District Court, Johnson County, case number LACV080644. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3777524., filed by Jaron Ennis. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 6/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Petition, #3 Exhibit 2 - Original Notice)(Streit, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Victory Boxing Promotions v. Ennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victory Boxing Promotions
Represented By: Laura Bergus
Represented By: Michael S. Miller
Represented By: Michael Sidney Miller
Represented By: Paul David Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaron Ennis
Represented By: David J Hellstern
Represented By: John S. Wirt
Represented By: Michael J Streit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?