Weiland v. American Red Cross

Plaintiff: Patricia Ann Weiland
Defendant: American Red Cross
Case Number: 3:2019cv00032
Filed: March 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Stephen B Jackson
Referring Judge: Stephanie M Rose
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12102
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated. See #6 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (kmc)
May 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Patricia Ann Weiland (Weiland, Kenneth)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR CLOSING DOCUMENTS: Given the Joint Notice of Settlement in Principle #4 , the parties shall file closing documents for the case by May 24, 2019. All other deadlines shall be stayed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 4/26/2019. (jeb)
April 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Settlement (Joint) by American Red Cross (Archer, Elisabeth)
April 19, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by American Red Cross. (Archer, Elisabeth)
March 29, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by American Red Cross re #1 Notice of Removal, LR 81A (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Archer, Elisabeth)
March 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American Red Cross from Iowa District Court for Des Moines County, case number LALA005134. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3779772., filed by American Red Cross. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 6/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Archer, Elisabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weiland v. American Red Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Red Cross
Represented By: Elisabeth A Archer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Ann Weiland
Represented By: Kenneth John Weiland, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?