Doe v. University of Iowa et al
Plaintiff: John Doe
Defendant: Lyn Redington, Board of Regents, State of Iowa, Constance Cervantes, Angie Reams, John Keller, Iris Frost, University of Iowa, Monique Dicarlo, Constance Schriver Cervantes, Tiffini Stevenson Earl and Mark Braun
Case Number: 3:2019cv00047
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Filing 8 Sealed Document re 6 Order on Motion for Leave to File, John Doe Affidavit of Identity by John Doe. (Cole, Rockne)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER as to #3 Errata Re Complaint and #5 Errata Re Errata Complaint. Neither the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure nor the Local Rules provide for erratas. To the extent Plaintiff wishes to file a complaint correcting errors in previous filings, Plaintiff is required to file an amended complaint pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15 and LR 15. Defendants cannot effectively respond to an errata. The operative complaint in this case remains the complaint filed at ECF No. 1 until an amended complaint compliant with Fed. R. Civ. P. 15 and LR 15 is filed. Signed by Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger on 6/26/2019. (hfh)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to File. Plaintiff may proceed anonymously, but must file an affidavit under seal identifying himself. This Order does not preclude Defendants from briefing the issue once they have appeared, or further review by the Court of the issue. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 6/25/2019. (imk)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 Errata re #3 Errata, #1 Complaint, filed by John Doe. (Cole, Rockne)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 Summons: Note: Counsel should download the attached summons. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons. (bp)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 Errata re #1 Complaint, filed by John Doe. (Cole, Rockne)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to File Anonymously by John Doe.Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. Responses due by 7/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Cole, Rockne)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3850549., filed by John Doe. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 9/19/2019. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 9/19/2019.(Cole, Rockne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. University of Iowa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lyn Redington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Regents, State of Iowa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Constance Cervantes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angie Reams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iris Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Iowa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monique Dicarlo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Constance Schriver Cervantes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffini Stevenson Earl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Braun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Rockne Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?