Wood v. TBIC, Inc.
Plaintiff: Lauren A Wood
Defendant: TBIC, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00051
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Stephen B Jackson
Referring Judge: Stephanie M Rose
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 JUDGMENT in favor of TBIC, Inc. against Lauren A Wood. Signed by Clerk John S. Courter on 8/23/2019. (kmc)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER dismissing case for lack of subject matter jurisdiction and denying as moot #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this matter. A copy of this Order has been mailed to Plaintiff at 432 W. 3d Street, Apt. 3, Davenport, IA 52801. Signed by Judge Stephanie M. Rose on 8/22/2019. (jch)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lauren A Wood. (bp)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against TBIC, Inc., filed by Lauren A Wood. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 11/5/2019. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 11/5/2019. (bp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wood v. TBIC, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren A Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TBIC, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?