Finn v. Syneos Health
Plaintiff: Kimberly Finn
Defendant: Syneos Health
Case Number: 3:2019cv00057
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: John A Jarvey
Referring Judge: Ross A Walters(R)
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Sarah E. Bouchard. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ross A Walters(R) on 9/25/2019. (kjw)
September 25, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3931336 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Syneos Health. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Bouchard, Sarah)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Lauren E. Marzullo. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ross A Walters(R) on 9/25/2019. (kjw)
September 25, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3931193 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Syneos Health. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Marzullo, Lauren)
September 23, 2019 Filing 7 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Defendant's Answer and Defenses by Syneos Health.(Haas, Frances)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Syneos Health. (Haas, Frances)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Defendant's Unresisted Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Removed Petition. Defendant shall move or plead to the petition on or before September 23, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ross A Walters(R) on 8/20/2019. (k)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 Unresisted MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,, Unresisted Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Removed Petition by Syneos Health.Motions referred to Ross A Walters(R). (Haas, Frances)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Packet. Note: Counsel should download the attached corporate disclosure packet. In compliance with Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 9/16/2019. (bp)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 STATEMENT Local Rule 81(a) Statement by Syneos Health. (Haas, Frances)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Syneos Health from Iowa District Court for Johnson County, case number LACV080949. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3896504., filed by Syneos Health. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 11/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice of Removal Petition, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Notice of Removal Original Notice, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Notice of Removal Return of Original Notice, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D to Notice of Removal Return of Service)(Haas, Frances)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Finn v. Syneos Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syneos Health
Represented By: Frances M. Haas
Represented By: Sarah E. Bouchard
Represented By: Lauren E. Marzullo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Finn
Represented By: Paige Ellen Fiedler
Represented By: Madison Elizabeth Fiedler-Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?