Wagneret al., v Bandici, et al.,
Plaintiff: Blake Reed Delivery Systems, LLC and William Wagner
Defendant: Cosmin Constant Bandici, Karizma Trucking and Fogz Logistics, LTD
Intervenor: Falls Lake National Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00058
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: Charles R Wolle
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1333in
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. A Scheduling Conference shall be held on 10/28/2019 at 10:00 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams in Room 420 at the Des Moines Courthouse. Counsel outside of Des Moines may attend telephonically. If they choose to do so, counsel should call 1-877-336-1829 and enter access code 1176783 at the prompt to be joined with the call. The parties shall file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan as provided under L.R. 16 by 10/22/2019. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 9/26/2019. (imk)
September 26, 2019 Filing 7 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint by Cosmin Constant Bandici, Fogz Logistics, LTD, Karizma Trucking.(Nafisi, Arman)
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Falls Lake Notice of Lien (Khaleel, Rubina)
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Bruce L. Carmen. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 8/22/2019. (slg)
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3902594 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Blake Reed Delivery Systems, LLC, William Wagner. (Carmen, Bruce)
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Blake Reed Delivery Systems, LLC, William Wagner. (Dane, Harold)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for plaintiff 9/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 LR 7.1 Packet) (bp)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by William Wagner and Blake Reed Delivery Systems, LLC. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 11/18/2019. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 11/18/2019.(Dane, Harold) Receipt #0863-3899189 in the amount of $400.00 Modified on 8/19/2019 added payment information(don).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wagneret al., v Bandici, et al.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cosmin Constant Bandici
Represented By: Arman Nafisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karizma Trucking
Represented By: Arman Nafisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fogz Logistics, LTD
Represented By: Arman Nafisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blake Reed Delivery Systems, LLC
Represented By: Harold John Dane, III
Represented By: Bruce L. Carmen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Wagner
Represented By: Harold John Dane, III
Represented By: Bruce L. Carmen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Falls Lake National Insurance Company
Represented By: Rubina Sahar Khaleel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?