Holt v. Milan Laser Corporate LLC
Plaintiff: Amanda Holt
Defendant: Milan Laser Corporate LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00062
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: John A Jarvey
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000ad
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN . (Washkuhn, Marcia)
October 10, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Milan Laser Corporate LLC. (Washkuhn, Marcia)
September 26, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached corporate disclosure packet in compliance with Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for Defendant 10/25/2019. (dmh)
September 26, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. A Scheduling Conference shall be held on 10/29/2019 at 10:00 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams in Room 420 at the Des Moines Courthouse. Counsel outside of Des Moines may attend telephonically. If they choose to do so, counsel should call 1-877-336-1829 and enter access code 1176783 at the prompt to be joined with the call. The parties shall file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan as provided under L.R. 16 by 10/22/2019. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 9/26/2019. (imk)
September 26, 2019 Filing 4 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by Milan Laser Corporate LLC.(Washkuhn, Marcia)
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amanda Holt. Milan Laser Corporate LLC served on 9/10/2019, answer due 10/1/2019. (Fieweger, Stephen)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (don)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Milan Laser Corporate LLC Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3910305., filed by Amanda Holt. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 11/29/2019. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 11/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Fieweger, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holt v. Milan Laser Corporate LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milan Laser Corporate LLC
Represented By: Marcia A Washkuhn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Holt
Represented By: Stephen T Fieweger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?