Raders v. Price et al
Plaintiff: James L. Raders
Defendant: RSM U.S., L.L.P. and Dean R. Price
Case Number: 3:2019cv00063
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Celeste F Bremer
Referring Judge: John A Jarvey
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated per Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice #5 . (bp)
September 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by James L. Raders (Dutton, David)
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James L. Raders. RSM U.S., L.L.P. served on 9/6/2019, answer due 9/27/2019. (Dutton, David)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of re: Service by James L. Raders. (Dutton, David)
September 5, 2019 Filing 2 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet. Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. (Attachments: #1 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Packet) (dmh)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Dean R Price, RSM U.S., L.L.P. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3911677., filed by James Raders. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 12/2/2019. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 12/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Priebe, Erich)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Raders v. Price et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RSM U.S., L.L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean R. Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James L. Raders
Represented By: Erich Dennis Priebe
Represented By: Joshua M Moon
Represented By: David J Dutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?