Hahn Ready-Mix Company v. Curry's Transportation Service et al
Plaintiff: Hahn Ready-Mix Company
Defendant: Daniel Portillo, Curry's Transportation Service and Curry's Transportation Service, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00064
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: John A Jarvey
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 49:14706
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Filing 13 TEXT ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. An In-Person Scheduling Conference shall be held on 11/26/2019 at 10:00 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams in Room 420 at the Des Moines Courthouse. The parties shall file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan as provided under L.R. 16 by 11/19/2019. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 10/21/2019. (imk)
October 21, 2019 Filing 12 Curry Transportation's ANSWER to Complaint Count I by Curry's Transportation Service, Inc..(Knoshaug, Kimberly)
October 16, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Counts II, III, and IV by Curry's Transportation Service, Inc., Daniel Portillo. Responses due by 10/30/2019. (Knoshaug, Kimberly)
October 2, 2019 Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall file an Answer to the Complaint or otherwise submit a responsive pleading by 10/16/2019. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 10/2/2019. (imk)
October 1, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Packet. Note: Counsel should download the attached corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for Defendants 11/1/2019. (dmh)
October 1, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Serve Responsive Pleading (Unresisted) by Curry's Transportation Service, Inc., Daniel Portillo.Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. (Knoshaug, Kimberly)
September 25, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hahn Ready-Mix Company. Daniel Portillo served on 9/7/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (Halligan, Kevin)
September 25, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hahn Ready-Mix Company. Curry's Transportation Service, Inc. served on 9/6/2019, answer due 9/27/2019. (Halligan, Kevin)
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. (Attachments: #1 LR 7.1 Packet) (bp)
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Hahn Ready-Mix Company. (Halligan, Kevin)
September 5, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Daniel Portillo. (Halligan, Kevin)
September 5, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Curry's Transportation Service. (Halligan, Kevin)
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3914168., filed by Hahn Ready-Mix Company. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 12/4/2019. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 12/4/2019.(Halligan, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hahn Ready-Mix Company v. Curry's Transportation Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Portillo
Represented By: Kimberly Pieters Knoshaug
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curry's Transportation Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curry's Transportation Service, Inc.
Represented By: Kimberly Pieters Knoshaug
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hahn Ready-Mix Company
Represented By: Kevin L Halligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?