Raybna, LLC et al v. Jersey Mike's Franchise Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: Raybna, LLC and Brian Farber
Defendant: Jersey Mike's Franchise Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00003
Filed: January 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: James E Gritzner
2 Judge: Stephen B Jackson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2020 Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion to Seal. The Clerk of Court shall seal Docket No. 10 in its entirety. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 2/11/2020. (imk)
February 11, 2020 Filing 11 Unresisted MOTION to Seal Defendant's Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration by Brian Farber, Raybna, LLC.Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. Responses due by 2/25/2020. (Craig, Elizabeth)
January 28, 2020 Filing 10 REPLY in Support re #4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Proceedings (Oral Argument Requested) filed by Jersey Mike's Franchise Systems, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7)(Beaman, Bradley) Sealed per Court Order on 2/11/2020 (rmj).
January 21, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Proceedings (Oral Argument Requested) filed by Brian Farber, Raybna, LLC. Replies due by 1/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Craig, Elizabeth)
January 9, 2020 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Defendant shall file its answer or other responsive pleading within 14 days of the Courts Ruling on the pending Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Proceedings #4 . Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 1/9/2020. (imk)
January 9, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Responsive Pleading by Jersey Mike's Franchise Systems, Inc..Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. Responses due by 1/23/2020. (Beaman, Bradley)
January 8, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Brian Farber, Raybna, LLC. (Craig, Elizabeth)
January 7, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Jersey Mike's Franchise Systems, Inc.. (Beaman, Bradley)
January 6, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Proceedings (Oral Argument Requested) by Jersey Mike's Franchise Systems, Inc..Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. Responses due by 1/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Proceedings)(Beaman, Bradley)
January 6, 2020 Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams added. Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr no longer assigned to case. (kjw)
January 6, 2020 Set Deadlines: Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for plaintiff 1/27/2020. (rmj)
January 6, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for 1/27/2020. (rmj) Modified on 1/6/2020 (rmj).
January 3, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by Jersey Mike's Franchise Systems, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, LOCAL RULE 81(a) REMOVAL LIST (Beaman, Bradley)
January 3, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jersey Mike's Franchise Systems, Inc. from Johnson, case number LACV081391. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-4021694., filed by Jersey Mike's Franchise Systems, Inc.. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 4/2/2020.(Beaman, Bradley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Raybna, LLC et al v. Jersey Mike's Franchise Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raybna, LLC
Represented By: Kevin J Caster
Represented By: Elizabeth J Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Farber
Represented By: Kevin J Caster
Represented By: Elizabeth J Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jersey Mike's Franchise Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Mark L Tripp
Represented By: Bradley M Beaman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?