Universal-Polygram International Publishing, Inc. et al v. Gabe's Oasis, L.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: M.L.E. Music, Universal-Polygram International Publishing, Inc., Songs of Peer LTD, Fixation Music, Inc. and Universal Music-Z Tunes, LLC
Defendant: Gabe's Oasis, L.L.C. and Scott Kading
Case Number: 3:2020cv00021
Filed: March 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: James E Gritzner
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCES. See Order for more particulars. Status Conference set for 7/10/2020 11:00 AM in Phone Hearing(HCA). Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783. Hearing will be held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Status Conference set for 9/9/2020 11:00 AM in Phone Hearing(HCA). Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783. Hearing will be held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Status Conference set for 11/9/2020 11:00 AM in Phone Hearing(HCA). Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783. Hearing will be held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Status Conference set for 1/7/2021 11:00 AM in Phone Hearing(HCA). Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783. Hearing will be held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams.. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 4/29/2020. (imk)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REGARDING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE REQUIREMENTS. See Order for particulars. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 4/29/2020. (imk)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER adopting #7 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN: Initial Disclosures Deadline 5/8/2020. Motions to Add Parties due by 6/22/2020. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 6/22/2020. Plaintiffs Expert Witness Disclosures due by 7/22/2020. Defendants Expert Witness Disclosures due by 9/22/2020. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Witness Disclosures due by 10/22/2020. Discovery Deadline 12/22/2020. Dispositive Motion Deadline 12/22/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/9/2021 10:00 AM in Davenport Courthouse before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Bench Trial set for 8/30/2021 09:00 AM in Davenport Courthouse before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Estimated length of three days. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 4/29/2020. (imk)
April 29, 2020 Filing 9 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams: Scheduling Conference held on 4/29/2020. Attorney Eric Hoch appeared for plaintiffs. Attorney Thomas Maxwell appeared for defendants. Status of case discussed. Separate Orders to follow. Total Court Time: 12 minutes. (imk)
April 23, 2020 Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams added. Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams and Senior Judge James E. Gritzner no longer assigned to case. (bp)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER OF REFERENCE - CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This matter is hereby referred to a U.S. Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings and entry of judgment in accordance with 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and the consent of the parties. Signed by Senior Judge James E. Gritzner on 4/22/2020. (nlh)
April 22, 2020 Filing 7 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN AND CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A MAGISTRATE . (Hoch, Eric) (Main Document 7 replaced. Took off worksheet and resent NEF on 4/22/2020) (bp).
March 31, 2020 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. A Telephonic Scheduling Conference shall be held on 4/29/2020 at 10:00 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Counsel should call 1-877-336-1829 and enter access code 1176783 at the prompt to be joined with the call. The parties shall file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan as provided under L.R. 16 by 4/22/2020. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 3/31/2020. (imk)
March 30, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Gabe's Oasis, L.L.C., Scott Kading.(Maxwell, Thomas)
March 11, 2020 Set Deadline: Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant, Gabe's Oasis, L.L.C., 4/8/2020. (rav)
March 10, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Universal Music-Z Tunes, LLC, Fixation Music, Inc., Universal-Polygram International Publishing, Inc., Songs of Peer LTD, M.L.E. Music. Gabe's Oasis, L.L.C. served on 3/9/2020, answer due 3/30/2020. (Hoch, Eric)
March 4, 2020 Filing 3 REPORT REGARDING COPYRIGHT mailed to registrar. (rav)
March 4, 2020 Filing 2 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet. Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for Plaintiff 3/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Corporate Disclosure Packet) (rav)
March 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT 3:20-cv-00021 against All Defendants Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-4077007., filed by UNIVERSAL MUSIC Z TUNES, FIXATION MUSIC INC, Universal Polygram International Publishing Inc., SONGS OF PEER LTD, MLE MUSIC. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 6/1/2020. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 6/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Interest)(Hoch, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Universal-Polygram International Publishing, Inc. et al v. Gabe's Oasis, L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.L.E. Music
Represented By: Eric G Hoch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal-Polygram International Publishing, Inc.
Represented By: Eric G Hoch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Songs of Peer LTD
Represented By: Eric G Hoch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fixation Music, Inc.
Represented By: Eric G Hoch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal Music-Z Tunes, LLC
Represented By: Eric G Hoch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabe's Oasis, L.L.C.
Represented By: Thomas E Maxwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Kading
Represented By: Thomas E Maxwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?