Grimes v. U.S. Department of Education et al
Plaintiff: Robert L. Grimes, Jr.
Defendant: U.S. Department of Education and National Recoveries, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00050
Filed: June 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: James E Gritzner
Referring Judge: Stephen B Jackson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Student Loan
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2020 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by National Recoveries, Inc.. (Bush, William)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Christopher A. Seidl. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr on 7/14/2020. (kjw)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jaime J. Wing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr on 7/10/2020. (kjw)
July 10, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert L. Grimes, Jr. National Recoveries, Inc. served on 6/18/2020, answer due 8/10/2020. (Dane, Harold)
July 10, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert L. Grimes, Jr. U.S. Department of Education served on 6/12/2020, answer due 8/11/2020. (Dane, Harold)
July 10, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-4185367 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by National Recoveries, Inc.. (Bush, William)
July 10, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-4185363 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by National Recoveries, Inc.. (Bush, William)
July 10, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by William J Bush on behalf of National Recoveries, Inc. (Bush, William)
July 9, 2020 Filing 7 ***FILED INCORRECTLY, SEE ENTRY #11 AND #12 *** CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Robert L. Grimes, Jr re #4 Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements., #3 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, #2 Summons Issued (Dane, Harold) Modified on 7/15/2020 (kjw).
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond. As requested, defendant National Recoveries, Inc. shall have until August 10, 2020, to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 7/8/2020. (jeb)
July 8, 2020 Filing 5 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by National Recoveries, Inc..Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. (Bush, William)
June 8, 2020 Filing 4 Summons: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1. (bp) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/8/2020: #1 LR 7.1 Packet) (bp).
June 5, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to National Recoveries, Inc.. (Dane, Harold)
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Department of Education. (Dane, Harold)
June 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Department of Education, National Recoveries, Inc. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-4153571., filed by Robert L. Grimes, Jr. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 9/3/2020. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 9/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dane, Harold)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grimes v. U.S. Department of Education et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert L. Grimes, Jr.
Represented By: Harold John Dane, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Recoveries, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher A. Seidl
Represented By: William J. Bush
Represented By: Jaime J. Wing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?