Moothart v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ethel Moothart
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00065
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Celeste F Bremer
Referring Judge: Stephanie M Rose
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Filing 7 REPLY to Motion re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court Pl's Response to DEF's Resistance to Pl's Motion to Remand filed by Ethel Moothart.(Kouri, Sarah) Modified on 10/6/2020 to Change to Reply and Remove Reply Date (kmc).
September 28, 2020 Filing 6 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. Replies due by 10/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Resistance to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)(Weston, Benjamin)
September 14, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Ethel Moothart. Responses due by 9/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support)(Kouri, Sarah)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Weston, Benjamin)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc..(Weston, Benjamin)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 9/17/2020. (kmc)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. from Washington County District Court, case number LALA002789. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-4220900., filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 11/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Pleadings, #3 Local Rule 81.A Statement)(Weston, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moothart v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ethel Moothart
Represented By: Sarah M. Kouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Weston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?