Lopez v. Beyer et al
Plaintiff: Griselda Lopez
Defendant: Nancy Beyer, Jane Aldrich, Mary Alterman, Debra Pelinski, David Beyer, Jane Beyer, Nancy Henderson, Mary Beyer and Debra Beyer
Case Number: 3:2022cv00021
Filed: April 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: Stephanie M Rose
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2022 Filing 18 Errata re #17 Amended Complaint filed by Griselda Lopez. (Winters, Ryan)
June 3, 2022 Filing 17 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. All Defendants., filed by Griselda Lopez.(Winters, Ryan)
May 23, 2022 Filing 16 TEXT ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. A Telephonic Scheduling Conference shall be held on 6/30/2022 at 10:00 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter access code 1176783 at the prompt to be joined with the call. The parties shall file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan as provided under L.R. 16 by 6/23/2022. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 5/23/2022. (jsa)
May 23, 2022 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint by Mary Alterman, David Beyer, Debra Pelinski.(Wolle, Thomas)
May 19, 2022 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Jane Aldrich, David Beyer, Nancy Beyer, Debra Pelinski, Mary Alterman; Mary Alterman waiver served on 5/18/2022, answer due 7/18/2022. (Wolle, Thomas)
May 19, 2022 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Jane Aldrich, David Beyer, Nancy Beyer, Debra Pelinski, Mary Alterman; Debra Pelinski waiver served on 5/18/2022, answer due 7/18/2022. (Wolle, Thomas)
May 19, 2022 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Jane Aldrich, David Beyer, Nancy Beyer, Debra Pelinski, Mary Alterman; David Beyer waiver served on 5/18/2022, answer due 7/18/2022. (Wolle, Thomas)
May 17, 2022 Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Kevin McDermott. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 5/17/2022. (btg)
May 17, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: AIASDC-4822303 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Griselda Lopez. (McDermott, Kevin)
May 17, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Griselda Lopez. Nancy Beyer served on 4/22/2022, answer due 5/13/2022. (Navarro, Gabriela)
May 16, 2022 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jospeh F. Scott. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 5/16/2022. (btg)
May 16, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: AIASDC-4820610 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Griselda Lopez. (Scott, Joseph)
May 13, 2022 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Jane Aldrich, Nancy Beyer.(Wolle, Thomas)
April 29, 2022 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Ryan A. Winters. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 4/29/2022. (kjw)
April 29, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: BIASDC-4806951 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Griselda Lopez. (Winters, Ryan)
April 29, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Griselda Lopez. Jane Aldrich served on 4/26/2022, answer due 5/17/2022. (Navarro, Gabriela)
April 12, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Note: Counsel should download the attached summons. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons. (bp)
April 11, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 402, receipt number AIASDC-4788545., filed by Griselda Lopez. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 7/11/2022. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 7/11/2022. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet)(Navarro, Gabriela)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez v. Beyer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Griselda Lopez
Represented By: Gabriela Navarro
Represented By: Andrew William Bribriesco
Represented By: Joseph Francis Scott
Represented By: Kevin M. McDermott, II
Represented By: Ryan Adam Winters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Beyer
Represented By: Thomas D Wolle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Aldrich
Represented By: Thomas D Wolle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Alterman
Represented By: Thomas D Wolle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Pelinski
Represented By: Thomas D Wolle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Beyer
Represented By: Thomas D Wolle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Beyer
Represented By: Thomas D Wolle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Henderson
Represented By: Thomas D Wolle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Beyer
Represented By: Thomas D Wolle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Beyer
Represented By: Thomas D Wolle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?