Cincinnati Insurance Company v. KLN Entertainment, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Cincinnati Insurance Company
Defendant: KLN Entertainment, LLC, Phillip Castellano, Nate Van Haaften, Alexandra O'Neill, Logan Van Zante and Kevin Cottington
Case Number: 4:2018cv00250
Filed: August 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Office: Central Office
County: Marion
Presiding Judge: Stephen B Jackson
Referring Judge: Stephanie M Rose
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by KLN Entertainment, LLC, Nate Van Haaften, Logan Van Zante.(Long, Scott)
August 30, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Cincinnati Insurance Company dismissing Kevin Cottington. (Frey, Michael)
August 24, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cincinnati Insurance Company. Phillip Castellano served on 8/17/2018, answer due 9/7/2018. (Frey, Michael)
August 24, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cincinnati Insurance Company. Alexandra O'Neill served on 8/17/2018, answer due 9/7/2018. (Frey, Michael)
August 24, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cincinnati Insurance Company. Kevin Cottington served on 8/17/2018, answer due 9/7/2018. (Frey, Michael)
August 24, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cincinnati Insurance Company. KLN Entertainment, LLC served on 8/17/2018, answer due 9/7/2018. (Frey, Michael)
August 24, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cincinnati Insurance Company. Logan Van Zante served on 8/17/2018, answer due 9/7/2018. (Frey, Michael)
August 24, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cincinnati Insurance Company. Nate Van Haaften served on 8/17/2018, answer due 9/7/2018. (Frey, Michael)
August 24, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Frey, Michael)
August 6, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for plaintiff 8/24/2018. (kmc)
August 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3561059., filed by Cincinnati Insurance Company. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 11/1/2018. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 11/1/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Frey, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cincinnati Insurance Company v. KLN Entertainment, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KLN Entertainment, LLC
Represented By: Scott L Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Castellano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nate Van Haaften
Represented By: Scott L Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexandra O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Logan Van Zante
Represented By: Scott L Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Cottington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cincinnati Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael J Frey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?