Webb v. Barr-Nunn Transportation, Inc.
Plaintiff: Tammie Webb
Defendant: Barr-Nunn Transportation, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2018cv00253
Filed: August 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Office: Central Office
County: Dallas
Presiding Judge: James E Gritzner
Referring Judge: Stephen B Jackson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12111
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting #13 Motion of Laura L. Folkerts to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiff. Pursuant to Local Rule 83(d)(6), attorney Laura L. Folkerts shall be allowed to withdraw as counsel and is relieved of her duties in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 10/4/2018. (jeb)
October 4, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Tammie Webb.Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Responses due by 10/18/2018. (Folkerts, Laura)
October 4, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by David Ronald Albrecht on behalf of Tammie Webb (Albrecht, David)
October 4, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Paige Ellen Fiedler on behalf of Tammie Webb (Fiedler, Paige)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion of Erin Patrick Lyons to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiff. Pursuant to Local Rule 83(d)(6), attorney Erin Patrick Lyons shall be allowed to withdraw as counsel and is relieved of his duties in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 10/1/2018. (jeb)
September 28, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Tammie Webb.Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Responses due by 10/12/2018. (Lyons, Erin)
September 28, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Lee Folkerts on behalf of Tammie Webb (Folkerts, Laura)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER CONTINUING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: At the request of counsel, the scheduling conference shall be continued until further order of the court. The parties shall have until October 5, 2018, to confer and file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan as provided under L.R. 16. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 9/24/2018. (jeb)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference shall be held on September 25, 2018, at 1:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. The parties shall confer and file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan as provided under L.R. 16 by September 19, 2018. To join the conference, counsel shall call 866-590-5055 and utilize access code 8811585. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 9/11/2018. (jeb)
September 7, 2018 Filing 5 WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Tammie Webb #3 Motion for Default Entry. (Lyons, Erin)
September 7, 2018 Filing 4 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand by Barr-Nunn Transportation, Inc..(Monthei, Sasha)
September 7, 2018 Filing 3 ***Withdrawn per entry 5*** MOTION for Default Entry in re Barr-Nunn Transportation, Inc. by Tammie Webb. Responses due by 9/21/2018. (Lyons, Erin) Modified on 9/10/2018 (vr).
September 6, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Barr-Nunn Transportation, Inc.. (Monthei, Sasha)
August 13, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 9/6/2018. Packet emailed to counsel. (sjc)
August 6, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by BARR NUNN from Dallas County District Court, case number CVCV041244. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3562608., filed by BARR NUNN. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 11/1/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Monthei, Sasha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Webb v. Barr-Nunn Transportation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barr-Nunn Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Sasha Lace Monthei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammie Webb
Represented By: Erin P Lyons
Represented By: Laura Lee Folkerts
Represented By: Paige Ellen Fiedler
Represented By: David Ronald Albrecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?